EP3658369 - FLAME RESISTANT, BREATHABLE PROTECTIVE GARMENTS FOR FIRE FIGHTERS AND FIRST RESPONDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INVISTA Textiles (U.K.) Limited One St. Peter's Square Manchester M2 3DE / GB | [2020/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Chuanpu 722 Pear Grove Place Marietta, Georgia 30066 / US | [2020/23] | Representative(s) | Cockerton, Bruce Roger Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2020/23] | Application number, filing date | 18753297.3 | 25.07.2018 | [2020/23] | WO2018US43593 | Priority number, date | US201762537494P | 27.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762537494 P | [2020/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019023293 | Date: | 31.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3658369 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/02, B32B27/12, B32B27/32, B32B27/40, B32B5/18, B32B5/24, A62B17/00 | [2020/23] | CPC: |
B32B5/022 (EP,KR,US);
A62B17/003 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/12 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/322 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/40 (EP,KR,US);
B32B5/024 (EP,KR,US);
B32B5/026 (EP,KR,US);
B32B5/18 (EP,KR,US);
B32B5/245 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2255/10 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2255/26 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2262/0246 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2262/0269 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/3065 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/724 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/23] | Title | German: | FLAMMFESTE ATMUNGSAKTIVE SCHUTZKLEIDUNG FÜR FEUERWEHR UND ERSTHELFER | [2020/23] | English: | FLAME RESISTANT, BREATHABLE PROTECTIVE GARMENTS FOR FIRE FIGHTERS AND FIRST RESPONDERS | [2020/23] | French: | VÊTEMENTS PROTECTEURS RÉSISTANT À LA FLAMME ET RESPIRANTS POUR POMPIERS ET PREMIERS INTERVENANTS | [2020/23] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/23] | 07.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/08] | 08.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2021/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2767180 (GORE W L & ASS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0048] *; | [X]US2014259328 (MAPLES ALLEN [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006] *; | [XY]EP0979043 (LION APPAREL INC [US]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * * figure 4 * * paragraph [0015] * [Y] 5-10; | [X]EP2263754 (LION APPAREL INC [US]) [X] 1-4 * figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024] *; | [Y]EP2274351 (KRATON POLYMERS US LLC [US], et al) [Y] 5-9 * paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0138] *; | [Y]US2014223648 (MUNTER MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] * | by applicant | US2008209611 | WO2015021310 | US7737224 |