EP3583259 - WARP-KNITTED FABRIC AND ELASTIC ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2019/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORISHITA, Kenichiro 6-7-29 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-Ku Tokyo 141-8684 / JP | [2019/52] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/52] | Application number, filing date | 18755060.3 | 15.02.2018 | [2019/52] | WO2018IB50934 | Priority number, date | JP20170028177 | 17.02.2017 Original published format: JP 2017028177 | [2019/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018150352 | Date: | 23.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3583259 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | D04B21/18 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
A61F13/08 (EP);
D04B21/18 (EP,US);
A41B17/00 (US);
A41D13/0015 (US);
A47G9/02 (US);
A61F13/49 (EP);
A61F13/49011 (US);
A41B2500/10 (US);
A41D2500/10 (US);
A61F2013/00119 (US);
D10B2501/02 (EP,US);
D10B2503/06 (EP,US);
D10B2509/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/52] | D04B21/14, D04B21/00, D04B21/18, D04B23/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] | Title | German: | KETTENGEWIRKE UND ELASTISCHER ARTIKEL | [2019/52] | English: | WARP-KNITTED FABRIC AND ELASTIC ARTICLE | [2019/52] | French: | TISSU TRICOTÉ EN CHAÎNE ET ARTICLE ÉLASTIQUE | [2019/52] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 11.08.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2451412 (MOLINIER SA) [X] 1-7,10-15 * the whole document * [Y] 8,9; | [XY]US4297858 (BLASBERG HELMAR, et al) [X] 1,2,4,10,15 * column 1, line 47 - column 5, line 15; figures 1-5; claims 1, 8, 9 * [Y] 5-7; | [XY]EP1350879 (GFD FABRICS INC [US]) [X] 1-7,10-14 * paragraphs [0007] - [0013] - [0 17] - [0022]; figures 1-4; claims 6, 15, 16 * [Y] 5-9 | International search | [Y]US4688403 (GAJJAR BHARAT J [US]) [Y] 1-3 * entire document *; | [Y]US2010168634 (LEEMING RAYMOND CHARLES [GB], et al) [Y] 1-3 * entire document *; | [A]JP2006257587 (ASAHI KASEI FIBERS CORP) [A] 1-3 * machine translation *; | [A]US3931721 (ADAMSON THOMAS E) [A] 1-3 * entire document *; | [A]US4786549 (RICHARDS DAVID T [US]) [A] 1-3 * entire document * |