EP3658224 - A PULSE GENERATING DEVICE FOR DELIVERY OF ELECTRICAL PULSES TO A DESIRED TISSUE OF A MAMMAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scandinavian ChemoTech AB Scheeletorget 1 223 63 Lund / SE | [2023/26] |
Former [2020/23] | For all designated states Scandinavian ChemoTech AB Baltzarsgatan 25 211 36 Malmö / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRICK, Mohan 740614 9299 Skatteverket Förmedlingsuppdrag Box 2820 403 20 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
PERSSON, Bertil RR Angantyrsgränd 19 224 75 Lund / SE | [2020/23] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 17067 200 10 Malmö / SE | [2020/23] | Application number, filing date | 18755724.4 | 27.07.2018 | [2020/23] | WO2018EP70446 | Priority number, date | SE20170050966 | 28.07.2017 Original published format: SE 1750966 | [2020/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019020802 | Date: | 31.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3658224 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3658224 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3658224 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/32, A61N1/05, A61M37/00, A61B18/12, A61B18/14, A61B18/00, C12M1/42 | [2020/23] | CPC: |
A61N1/327 (EP,SE,US);
A61N1/00 (SE);
A61N1/0404 (SE);
A61N1/0412 (SE);
A61N1/0476 (SE);
A61N1/0502 (EP,US);
A61N1/36002 (SE);
A61N1/36017 (SE);
A61B18/1206 (EP);
A61B18/1477 (EP);
A61B2018/00613 (EP);
A61B2018/00636 (SE);
A61B2018/00642 (EP);
A61B2018/00875 (SE);
A61B2018/1425 (SE);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PULSGENERATOR ZUR ABGABE ELEKTRISCHER IMPULSE AN EIN GEWÜNSCHTES GEWEBE EINES SÄUGERS | [2020/23] | English: | A PULSE GENERATING DEVICE FOR DELIVERY OF ELECTRICAL PULSES TO A DESIRED TISSUE OF A MAMMAL | [2020/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'IMPULSIONS DESTINÉ À L'ADMINISTRATION D'IMPULSIONS ÉLECTRIQUES À UN TISSU SOUHAITÉ D'UN MAMMIFÈRE | [2020/23] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/23] | 14.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 23.05.2023 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | IE | 27.07.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/16] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 07.09.2023 | |
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 07.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6117660 (WALTERS RICHARD E [US], et al) [X] 1-4,11-13 * column 8, line 62 - column 12, line 2 * * column 17, line 47 - column 20, line 60; figures 1, 2, 5, 6 * * column 22, lines 34-41 * * column 23, lines 1-41 * * column 24, lines 44-46 *; | [X]US2002165531 (GOBLE COLIN C O [GB]) [X] 1,11-13 * paragraphs [0013] - [0020] - [0092] - [0097] - [0109] - [0117]; figures 14,20; claims 1-5 *; | [XI]US2007242743 (SCHERMAN YVES [FR]) [X] 1,2,8,10-13 * paragraphs [0165] - [0209] - [0237] - [0275] - [0291] - [0318] - [0343] - [0345]; figures 1-3c, 23-25B; claims 1-6, 11 * [I] 3-7,9; | [X]US2012179154 (GOLDBERG S NAHUM [US], et al) [X] 1,11-13 * paragraphs [0008] - [0015] - [0032] - [0046]; figures 6-7 *; | [A]US2016338758 (DAVALOS RAFAEL V [US], et al) [A] 1-13* paragraphs [0002] , [0010] - [0019] - [0033] - [0038] - [0112] - [0119]; figures 3-5 * | by applicant | WO9814238 | WO9952589 |