EP3672953 - BENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES USEFUL AS POTASSIUM CHANNEL INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acesion Pharma ApS Ole Maaløes Vej 3 2200 Copenhagen N / DK | [2020/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SØRENSEN, Ulrik Ole Maaloes Vej 3 2200 Copenhagen / DK | 02 /
METE, Antonio Ole Maaloes Vej 3 2200 Copenhagen / DK | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | Kjerrumgaard, Lars Bo, et al Nex & Phister Law & IP ApS Cobis Ole Maaløes Vej 3 2200 København N / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2021/30] | Kjerrumgaard, Lars Bo, et al Nex & Phister ApS Cobis Ole Maaløes Vej 3 2200 København N / DK | ||
Former [2020/27] | Kjerrumgaard, Lars Bo LBKPATENT APS Cobis Ole Maaløes Vej 3 2200 Copenhagen / DK | Application number, filing date | 18755828.3 | 22.08.2018 | [2020/27] | WO2018EP72621 | Priority number, date | EP20170020378 | 23.08.2017 Original published format: EP 17020378 | [2020/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019038315 | Date: | 28.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3672953 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3672953 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/12, C07D401/12, C07D235/30, C07D405/12, C07D413/12, A61P9/06, A61K31/4184 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
C07D413/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
A61P9/06 (EP);
C07D235/30 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BENZIMIDAZOLDERIVATE ALS KALIUMKANALINHIBITOREN | [2020/27] | English: | BENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES USEFUL AS POTASSIUM CHANNEL INHIBITORS | [2020/27] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE BENZIMIDAZOLE UTILES COMME INHIBITEURS DE CANAL POTASSIQUE | [2020/27] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 10.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.08.2018 | AL | 28.07.2021 | AT | 28.07.2021 | CY | 28.07.2021 | CZ | 28.07.2021 | DK | 28.07.2021 | EE | 28.07.2021 | FI | 28.07.2021 | HR | 28.07.2021 | LT | 28.07.2021 | LV | 28.07.2021 | MC | 28.07.2021 | MK | 28.07.2021 | PL | 28.07.2021 | RO | 28.07.2021 | RS | 28.07.2021 | SE | 28.07.2021 | SI | 28.07.2021 | SK | 28.07.2021 | SM | 28.07.2021 | LU | 22.08.2021 | BE | 31.08.2021 | BG | 28.10.2021 | NO | 28.10.2021 | GR | 29.10.2021 | IS | 28.11.2021 | PT | 29.11.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 22.08.2018 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
LU | 22.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
LU | 22.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
LU | 22.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
LU | 22.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
LU | 22.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
LU | 22.08.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006074991 (NEUROSEARCH AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-33* claims 1,10 *; | [A]WO2013104577 (ACESION PHARMA APS [DK], et al) [A] 1-33 * page 1, line 6 - line 10; claim 1 *; | [AP]WO2017144183 (ACESION PHARMA APS [DK]) [AP] 1-33 * page 4, line 1 - line 5; claims 1,36 *; | [A] - ULRIK S. SOERENSEN ET AL, "Synthesis and Structure-Activity Relationship Studies of 2-(N-Substituted)-aminobenzimidazoles as Potent Negative Gating Modulators of Small Conductance Ca 2+ -Activated K + Channels", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (20081211), vol. 51, no. 23, doi:10.1021/jm800809f, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 7625 - 7634, XP055054130 [A] 1-33 * page 7627, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm800809f | by applicant | WO2006013210 | - WULFF H et al., "Modulators of Small- and Intermediate-Conductance Calcium-Activated Potassium Channels and their Therapeutic Indications", Currrent Medicinal Chemistry, (20070000), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.2174/092986707780831186, pages 1437 - 1457, XP002470707 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/092986707780831186 | - LIEGEOIS J-F et al., "Modulation of small conductance calcium-activated potassium (SK) channels: a new challenge in medicinal chemistry", Current Medicinal Chemistry, (20030000), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.2174/0929867033457908, pages 625 - 647, XP009078299 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/0929867033457908 | - NATTEL S, J. Physiol., (20090000), vol. 587, pages 1385 - 1386 | - DINESS JG; SORENSEN US; NISSEN JD; AL-SHAHIB B; JESPERSEN T; GRUNNET M; HANSEN RS, Circ. Arrhythm. Electrophysiol., (20100000), vol. 3, pages 380 - 90 | - DINESS et al., Hypertension, (20110000), vol. 57, pages 1129 - 1135 |