EP3659298 - OVERLAPPING CONTROL RESOURCE SETS WITH DIFFERENT PRIORITY LEVELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2023/33] |
Former [2020/23] | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Jing 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Wanshi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
GAAL, Peter 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
MONTOJO, Juan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
LEE, Heechoon 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | [2020/23] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2023/33] |
Former [2020/23] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18756325.9 | 26.07.2018 | [2020/23] | WO2018US43895 | Priority number, date | US201762538612P | 28.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762538612 P | US201816045524 | 25.07.2018 Original published format: US201816045524 | [2020/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019023451 | Date: | 31.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3659298 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3659298 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L41/0813, H04L41/0866, H04L5/00, H04W24/02, H04W72/56, H04L43/0876, // H04W72/23 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
H04L41/0813 (EP,US);
H04W72/56 (EP,US);
H04L41/0866 (EP,US);
H04L43/0876 (EP,US);
H04L5/0016 (US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
H04L5/0064 (EP,US);
H04L5/0094 (EP,US);
H04W24/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/23] | H04L12/24, H04L12/26, H04W28/18, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERLAPPENDE STEUERRESSOURCENSETS MIT VERSCHIEDENEN PRIORITÄTSSTUFEN | [2020/23] | English: | OVERLAPPING CONTROL RESOURCE SETS WITH DIFFERENT PRIORITY LEVELS | [2020/23] | French: | ENSEMBLES DE RESSOURCES DE COMMANDE SE CHEVAUCHANT AVEC DIFFÉRENTS NIVEAUX DE PRIORITÉ | [2020/23] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/23] | 11.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2023 | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | IT | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SI | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2016161316 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 6,8,10-13* the whole document *; | [XAI]WO2017078854 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9,15,17,18,20-22,24-26,28,29 * abstract * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0088] * [A] 3,23 [I] 6,8,10-14,16,19,27,30; | [A]US2017142694 (YERRAMALLI SRINIVAS [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0122] * |