EP3586160 - LIDAR SCANNING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELWHA LLC 3150 139th Ave SE Bellevue, WA 98005-4046 / US | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKSELROD, Gleb M. 10710 N.E. 10th St. Apt 304 Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US | 02 /
WEIDMAN, Mark C. 11011 N.E. 9th St. Apt. 306 Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US | 03 /
JOSBERGER, Erik Edward 2901 N.E. Blakeley St., 328 Seattle, Washington 98105 / US | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/01] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 18756855.5 | 21.02.2018 | [2020/01] | WO2018US19036 | Priority number, date | US201762462105P | 22.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762462105 P | US201715790337 | 23.10.2017 Original published format: US201715790337 | [2020/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018156643 | Date: | 30.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3586160 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/481, G01S7/486, G01S17/42, G02B5/18, G02F1/1334, G02F1/29, G03F7/20, B82Y20/00, B29D11/00, G03H1/02, H01L27/146, H01Q15/00, H01Q15/14 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
H01L27/14625 (EP,US);
G01S7/4816 (KR);
B29D11/00326 (US);
B29D11/00346 (EP);
B29D11/0074 (EP);
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
G01S17/10 (US);
G01S17/42 (EP,US);
G01S17/89 (US);
G01S7/4813 (US);
G01S7/4817 (EP,KR,US);
G01S7/4865 (KR);
G02B5/1809 (EP,US);
G02F1/0107 (US);
G02F1/1339 (US);
G02F1/1341 (US);
G02F1/292 (EP,US);
G03H1/00 (US);
G03H1/0244 (EP,US);
G03H1/0443 (US);
H01J37/3174 (US);
H01J37/32816 (US);
H01L25/0657 (EP);
H01L27/14643 (EP,US);
H01Q1/38 (US);
H01Q15/002 (EP,US);
H01Q15/0066 (EP,US);
H01Q15/02 (US);
H01Q15/148 (EP,US);
H01Q3/44 (US);
H04N23/54 (US);
H04N25/76 (US);
G02B6/1226 (US);
G02F1/13342 (EP,US);
G02F2202/103 (US);
G02F2202/30 (EP,US);
G02F2202/36 (EP,US);
G03F7/2041 (EP,US);
G03F7/2059 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/01] | G01S7/481, G01S7/486 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] | Title | German: | LIDARABTASTSYSTEM | [2020/01] | English: | LIDAR SCANNING SYSTEM | [2020/01] | French: | SYSTÈME DE BALAYAGE PAR LIDAR | [2020/01] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 27.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2015187221 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0042] , [0 43] , [0 52] ** paragraphs [0053] , [0 55] *; | [Y]US2016041266 (SMITS GERARD DIRK [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0038] , [ 139 ] - [ 151] * * paragraph [0229] * | International search | [A]US2009135086 (FULLER CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [A] 1-55 * See paragraphs [0052]-[0056] : claim 1; and figures 1, 3, 5. *; | [A]US2014240692 (TIEN AN-CHUN [US], et al) [A] 1-55 * See paragraphs [00271-[00301; and figures 2, 3A. *; | [A]US2015030256 (BRADY DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-55 * See figure 1. *; | [A]US2016196943 (JARRAHI MONA [US], et al) [A] 1-55* See figures 1-2. *; | [A]WO2016135694 (UNIV WAYNE STATE [US]) [A] 1-55 * See figures 1, 6. * | by applicant | WO2015187221 | US2016041266 |