EP3837809 - MUTUAL 3GPP-TSN QOS ADAPTION AND SHAPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANNWEILER, Christian Unterhachinger Str. 53 81737 Munich / DE | 02 /
GAJIC, Borislava Bussardstrasse 38 82008 Unterhaching / DE | 03 /
ROST, Peter Struvestr. 24 69124 Heidelberg / DE | 04 /
MARKWART, Christian Metzstr. 14a 81667 Munich / DE | 05 /
SIVASIVA GANESAN, Rakash Von-Stauffenberg-Strasse 20 82008 Unterhaching / DE | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 18758566.6 | 14.08.2018 | [2021/25] | WO2018EP72046 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020035133 | Date: | 20.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3837809 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/40, H04W28/02 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
H04L12/40 (EP);
H04W28/0268 (EP,US);
H04L12/413 (EP);
H04L12/4625 (EP);
H04L12/4633 (EP,US);
H04L45/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Title | German: | ANPASSUNG UND FORMUNG VON GEGENSEITIGER 3GPP-TSN-DIENSTGÜTE | [2021/25] | English: | MUTUAL 3GPP-TSN QOS ADAPTION AND SHAPING | [2021/25] | French: | ADAPTATION ET MISE EN FORME DE QUALITÉ DE SERVICE (QOS) DE PROJET DE PARTENARIAT DE TROISIÈME GÉNÉRATION (3GPP)-RÉSEAUTAGE SENSIBLE AU TEMPS (TSN) (3GPP-TSN) MUTUELLE | [2021/25] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 15.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2009089455 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0030] - [0043] *; | [I] - NEUMANN ARNE ET AL, "Towards integration of Industrial Ethernet with 5G mobile networks", 2018 14TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON FACTORY COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS (WFCS), IEEE, (20180613), doi:10.1109/WFCS.2018.8402373, pages 1 - 4, XP033369592 [I] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WFCS.2018.8402373 | [Y] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Core Network and Terminals; 5G System; Interworking between 5G Network and external Data Networks; Stage 3 (Release 15)", 3GPP STANDARD; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION; 3GPP TS 29.561, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20180426), vol. CT WG3, no. V0.5.0, pages 1 - 42, XP051451185 [Y] 1-22 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] * | [A] - Ahmed Nasrallah ET AL, "Ultra-Low Latency (ULL) Networks: A Comprehensive Survey Covering the IEEE TSN Standard and Related ULL esearch", (20180320), URL: https://ieeexplore.ieee.org/iel7/9739/5451756/08458130.pdf, (20190228), XP055563110 [A] 1-22 * paragraphs [0007] , [0009] * | [T] - NOKIA ET AL, "Integration of the 5G System in a TSN network", vol. SA WG2, no. Sophia Antipolis; 20180820 - 20180824, (20180814), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-188100-ARCHITECTURE_FOR_TSN_INTEGRATION_WITH_5G-V2, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRAN, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fsa/WG2%5FArch/TSGS2%5F128BIS%5FSophia%5FAntipolis/Docs/S2%2D188100%2Ezip, (20180814), XP051537039 | by applicant | - R. Hummen, S. Kehrer, O. Kleineberg, "TSN - Time Sensitive Networking", White Paper, Hirschmann | - "Stream Reservation Protocol (SRP) Enhancements and Performance Improvements", IEEE 802.1 Qcc, URL: http://www.ieee802.org/1/pages/802.1cc.html | WO2018EP54916 | WO2018EP61892 |