EP3630538 - DEVICE FOR IMPROVING THE ACCESSIBILITY OF THE STORAGE SPACE BELOW VEHICLE SEATS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Constin GmbH Bennigsenstr. 14 12159 Berlin / DE | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONSTIEN, Hans-Peter Bennigsenstr. 14 12159 Berlin / DE | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Kayser, Christoph Kayser & Cobet Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Am Borsigturm 9 13507 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/15] | Kietzmann, Manfred Patentanwaltskanzlei Friedrichstrasse 95 IHZ P.O. Box 4 10117 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 18758801.7 | 28.05.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018DE00166 | Priority number, date | DE20171005267 | 29.05.2017 Original published format: DE102017005267 | DE20172002920U | 29.05.2017 Original published format: DE 202017002920 U | [2020/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018219375 | Date: | 06.12.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3630538 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/06, B60N2/04, B60N2/30 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
B60N2/06 (EP);
B60N2/045 (EP,US);
B60N2/3056 (EP,US);
B60N2/3065 (EP);
B60N2/3088 (US);
B60N2/309 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER ZUGÄNGLICHKEIT DES STAURAUMES UNTERHALB VON FAHRZEUGSITZEN | [2020/15] | English: | DEVICE FOR IMPROVING THE ACCESSIBILITY OF THE STORAGE SPACE BELOW VEHICLE SEATS | [2020/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AMÉLIORATION DE L'ACCESSIBILITÉ À L'ESPACE DE RANGEMENT AU-DESSOUS DE SIÈGES DE VÉHICULES | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 19.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/10] | 27.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3601351 (AMBROSIUS MANFRED) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [YA]US3687484 (COSBY HENRY L) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * [A] 11; | [A]US2003197393 (HANAGAN MICHAEL W [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2873555 (TACHI S CO [JP]) [A] 1-11* the whole document * | by applicant | DE102011122101 | WO2016082818 |