EP3669318 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR COMPUTER-SUPPORTED HAIR TREATMENT CONSULTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/26] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATHIASZYK, Carsten Kevelohbusch 1A 45277 Essen / DE | 02 /
LECHNER, Torsten Stefenshovener Str. 25 40764 Langenfeld / DE | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 18759271.2 | 14.08.2018 | [2020/26] | WO2018EP72059 | Priority number, date | DE201710214251 | 16.08.2017 Original published format: DE102017214251 | [2020/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019034664 | Date: | 21.02.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3669318 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/06 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0631 (EP,US);
A45D44/005 (US);
G06Q30/06 (EP);
G06Q30/0623 (US);
G06Q30/0633 (US);
G06Q30/0639 (US);
G06T7/90 (US);
A45D2044/007 (US);
G06T2207/10024 (US);
G06T2207/30201 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR COMPUTERGESTÜTZTEN HAARBEHANDLUNGSBERATUNG | [2020/26] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR COMPUTER-SUPPORTED HAIR TREATMENT CONSULTATION | [2020/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CONSEIL EN TRAITEMENT DES CHEVEUX ASSISTÉ PAR ORDINATEUR | [2020/26] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 29.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2005244057 (IKEDA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] - [0031] - [0046] , [0047] , [0049] , [0084] , [0088] , [0096] , [0097] , [0102] , [0103] *; | [I]US2013129210 (NA SEUNG WON [KR]) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0011] - [0024] - [0033] ** claims 1-16 *; | [I]DE102015225459 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0017] - [0032] - [0035] - [0054] * |