EP3668599 - SULFONYLUREAS AND SULFONYLTHIOUREAS AS NLRP3 INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 24.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inflazome Limited 88 Harcourt Street Dublin 2 / IE | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COOPER, Matthew c/o Inflazome UK Limited D6 Grain House Mill Court Great Shelford Cambridge CB22 5LD / GB | 02 /
MILLER, David c/o Inflazome UK Limited D6 Grain House Mill Court Great Shelford Cambridge CB22 5LD / GB | 03 /
MACLEOD, Angus c/o Inflazome UK Limited D6 Grain House Mill Court Great Shelford Cambridge CB22 5LD / GB | 04 /
THOM, Stephen c/o Sygnature Discovery Limited The Discovery Building BioCity Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GR / GB | 05 /
ST-GALLAY, Stephen c/o Sygnature Discovery Limited The Discovery Building BioCity Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GR / GB | 06 /
SHANNON, Jonathan c/o Sygnature Discovery Limited The Discovery Building BioCity Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GR / GB | 07 /
ALANINE, Thomas c/o Sygnature Discovery Limited The Discovery Building BioCity Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GR / GB | 08 /
ONIONS, Stuart c/o Sygnature Discovery Limited The Discovery Building BioCity Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GR / GB | 09 /
STRUTT, Ian c/o Sygnature Discovery Limited The Discovery Building BioCity Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GR / GB | 10 /
CARRILLO ARREGUI, Jokin c/o Sygnature Discovery Limited The Discovery Building BioCity Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GR / GB | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Bernard, Guillaume F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2020/26] | Johnson, Stephen William, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18759274.6 | 15.08.2018 | [2020/26] | WO2018EP72119 | Priority number, date | GB20170013082 | 15.08.2017 Original published format: GB 201713082 | GB20170018563 | 09.11.2017 Original published format: GB 201718563 | GB20170021731 | 22.12.2017 Original published format: GB 201721731 | GB20170021726 | 22.12.2017 Original published format: GB 201721726 | GB20180010983 | 04.07.2018 Original published format: GB 201810983 | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019034690 | Date: | 21.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3668599 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61P31/00, A61P25/28, A61P29/00, A61P35/00, A61P3/10, C07D231/18, C07D233/84, C07D401/04, C07D401/12, C07D403/04, C07D403/06, C07D403/12, C07D405/04, C07D405/12, C07D413/06, C07D417/04, C07D249/04, C07D249/12, C07D471/04, C07D487/04 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
C07D231/18 (EP,KR,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/415 (KR);
A61K31/4155 (KR);
A61K31/4418 (EP);
A61K31/4427 (EP);
A61K31/4433 (EP);
A61K31/4439 (EP,KR);
A61K31/444 (EP);
A61K31/445 (EP);
A61K31/4985 (KR);
A61K31/506 (KR);
A61K31/5377 (EP,KR);
A61K45/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/00 (EP,KR);
A61P25/28 (EP,KR);
A61P29/00 (EP,KR);
A61P3/10 (EP,KR);
A61P31/00 (EP,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
A61P37/00 (EP,KR);
C07D213/36 (EP,KR);
C07D213/44 (EP,KR);
C07D213/64 (EP,KR,US);
C07D233/84 (EP,KR);
C07D249/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D249/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,KR);
C07D403/04 (EP,KR);
C07D403/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,KR);
C07D405/04 (EP,KR);
C07D405/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Extension states | BA | 27.02.2020 | ME | 27.02.2020 | Validation states | KH | 27.02.2020 | MA | 27.02.2020 | MD | 27.02.2020 | TN | 27.02.2020 | Title | German: | SULFONYLHARNSTOFFE UND SULFONYLTHIOHARNSTOFFE ALS NLRP3-INHIBITOREN | [2020/26] | English: | SULFONYLUREAS AND SULFONYLTHIOUREAS AS NLRP3 INHIBITORS | [2020/26] | French: | SULFONYLUREÉS ET SULFONYLTHIOUREÉS EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE NLRP3 | [2020/26] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 27.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 04.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 28.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | 04.01.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 04.01.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.01.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4802908 (HILLEMANN CRIAG L [US]) [X] 1,2,6-8,12-14,20 * column 149 - column 150; compounds 10,11 * [A] 3-5,9-11,15-19,21-29; | [XI]WO0119390 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,12-16,18-20,22-24,26,27 * the whole document * * in particular abstract and compounds with the Registry Number 210826-34-9 and 210826-45-2 * [I] 3-5,8-11,17,21,25,28,29; | [XI]WO2006085815 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-8,10-14,17,20,22-24,26,27 * the whole document * * in particular examples 11, 12, 16, 19, 24, 37 and 38 * [I] 9,15,16,18,19,21,25,28,29; | [XA]EP2781216 (KYOWA HAKKO KIRIN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3-5,10,12,13,22-24,26,27 * the whole document * * in particular paragraph [0001] and compounds with the Registry Number 1333213-87-8 and 1333214-09-7 * [A] 2,6-9,11,14-21,25,28,29; | [XDI]WO2016131098 (UNIV QUEENSLAND [AU], et al) [XD] 1-8,11-16,18-20,22-29 * the whole document * * in particular abstract, claims (see claim 36) and pages 42, 46, 173, 213, 255, 280 * [I] 9,10,17,21; | [IDP]WO2017140778 (UNIV QUEENSLAND [AU], et al) [IDP] 1-29 * the whole document * * in particular the abstract, the examples, the claims, and on page 69 the 6th, 8th and 10th compound *; | [XDPI]WO2017184604 (IFM THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [XDP] 1,2,7,8,11-15,18-20,22-29 * the whole document * * in particular abstract, and compound 213 on page 256 and claim 122 * [I] 3-6,9,10,16,17,21; | [XDPI]WO2018136890 (JECURE THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [XDP] 1,3-5,10-16,18-29 * the whole document * * in particular abstract, specific compounds on pages 148, 151, 152, 154, 159, 189, 190, 191, 193, 347, 350, examples 60-66 and claims 65 and 66 * [I] 2,6-9; | [XA] - "Acetamide, N-[5-[[[[(2,5-dioxo-4-imidazolidinyl)amino]carbonyl]amino]sulfonyl]-4-methyl-2-thiazolyl-", REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20060920), XP002785020 [X] 1,2,6,7,12,13,20 * Compound with the Registry Number 907958-32-1 * [A] 3-5,8-11,14-19,21-29 | [XA] - "1H-1,2,4-Triazole-1-carboxamide, N-(2-chlorophenyl)-5-[[[[(2-chlorophenyl)amino]carbonyl]amino]sulfonyl]-", REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20040315), XP002785021 [X] 1-8,12-14,20 * Compound with the Registry Number 663215-37-0 * [A] 9-11,15-19,21-29 | [XA] - YOUSSEF, KHAIRIA M.; AL-ABDULLAH, EBTIHAL; EL-KHAMEES, HAMAD, "Synthesis of sulofenur analogs as antitumour agents: Part II", MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 11, no. 9, ISSN 1054-2523, pages 481 - 503, XP009509405 [X] 1,2,6,7,12,13,20,24,26,27 * abstract * * page 491; table 2; compound 28 * [A] 3-5,8-11,14-19,21-23,25,28,29 | [XA] - Youssef, Khairia M.; Shouman, Samia, "N1,N3-Diaryl sulfonylureas as possible anticancer agents", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1995), Database accession no. 123:339790, XP002786579 [X] 1,2,6,7,12,13,20,24,26,27 * abstract * * Compound with the Registry Number 170648-58-5 * [A] 3-5,8-11,14-19,21-23,25,28,29 | [XA] - Zimmerman, William T., "Preparation of herbicidal sulfonylureas.", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1995), Database accession no. 122:49104, XP002786580 [X] 1,3,5,10,12-14,20 * abstract * * Compound with the Registry Number 1238307-74-8 * [A] 2,4,6-9,11,15-19,21-29 | [XA] - Yamamoto, Susumu; Kakuta, Takuya; Sato, Toshiaki; Morimoto, Katsushi; Oya, Eiichi; Ikai, Takashi; Nawamaki, Tsutomu, "Pyrazolesulfonamides and herbicides containing them", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1986), Database accession no. 105:191075, XP002786581 [X] 1-7,11-14,20 * abstract * * Compound with the Registry Number 104843-72-3 * [A] 8-10,15-19,21-29 | [XA] - Ouf, A. A. Abou; El-Kerdawy, M. M.; Farghaly, A. M.; Gad, L. M., "Sulfonyl ureas and thioureas of 1,3,4-thiadiazole to be tested as hypoglycemic agents", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1983), Database accession no. 98:107226, XP002786582 [X] 1,2,4,6,7,12-14,20,24,26 * abstract * * Compounds with the Registry Number 884884-72-0, 84884-75-3, 84884-76-4, 84884-82-2 and 84884-90-2 * [A] 3,5,8-11,15-19,21-23,25,27-29 | [XA] - "Hypoglycemic acylaminoalkylthiophenesulfonylureas", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1972), Database accession no. 77:5318, XP002786583 [X] 1,2,12,13,20,22-24,26 * abstract * * Compound with the Registry Number 36628-63-4 * [A] 3-11,14-19,21,25,27-29 |