EP3661885 - PROTECTIVE LAYER OVER A FUNCTIONAL COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vitro Flat Glass LLC 400 Guys Run Road Cheswick, PA 15024 / US | [2020/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GANJOO, Ashtosh 5009 Apple Ridge Drive Allison Park Pennsylvania 15101 / US | 02 /
NARANAYAN, Sudarshan 8 Eden Court, Eden Street Cambridge, CB1 1ES / GB | 03 /
FINLEY, James J. 111 Cornwall Drive Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15238 / US | [2020/42] |
Former [2020/24] | 01 /
GANJOO, Ashtosh 5009 Apple Ridge Drive Allison Park Pennsylvania 15101 / US | ||
02 /
NARANAYAN, Sudarshan 5628 Hempstead Road Apt. 201 Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15217 / US | |||
03 /
FINLEY, James J. 111 Cornwall Drive Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15238 / US | Representative(s) | f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2020/24] | Application number, filing date | 18759463.5 | 02.08.2018 | [2020/24] | WO2018US45074 | Priority number, date | US201715669414 | 04.08.2017 Original published format: US201715669414 | [2020/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019028296 | Date: | 07.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3661885 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3661885 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/34, C03C17/36 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
C03C17/3417 (EP,US);
C23C14/086 (KR);
H01B5/14 (US);
C03C17/245 (EP);
C03C17/36 (US);
C03C17/3642 (US);
C23C14/024 (KR);
C23C14/35 (KR);
C23C14/5806 (KR);
C23C30/00 (US);
C03C2217/231 (EP);
C03C2217/24 (EP);
C03C2217/78 (US);
C03C2217/94 (EP);
C03C2217/948 (EP);
C03C2218/156 (EP);
H01L31/02167 (US);
H01L31/022475 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUTZSCHICHT ÜBER EINER FUNKTIONELLEN BESCHICHTUNG | [2020/24] | English: | PROTECTIVE LAYER OVER A FUNCTIONAL COATING | [2020/24] | French: | COUCHE PROTECTRICE SUR UN REVÊTEMENT FONCTIONNEL | [2020/24] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 14.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21179440.9 / EP3907200 | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.08.2018 | AL | 30.06.2021 | AT | 30.06.2021 | CY | 30.06.2021 | CZ | 30.06.2021 | DK | 30.06.2021 | EE | 30.06.2021 | FI | 30.06.2021 | HR | 30.06.2021 | LT | 30.06.2021 | LV | 30.06.2021 | MC | 30.06.2021 | MK | 30.06.2021 | PL | 30.06.2021 | RO | 30.06.2021 | RS | 30.06.2021 | SE | 30.06.2021 | SI | 30.06.2021 | SK | 30.06.2021 | SM | 30.06.2021 | IE | 02.08.2021 | LU | 02.08.2021 | CH | 31.08.2021 | LI | 31.08.2021 | BG | 30.09.2021 | NO | 30.09.2021 | GR | 01.10.2021 | IS | 30.10.2021 | PT | 02.11.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 02.08.2018 | |
AL | 30.06.2021 | ||
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CY | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 02.08.2021 | ||
LU | 02.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CY | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 02.08.2021 | ||
LU | 02.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/19] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 02.08.2021 | ||
LU | 02.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 02.08.2021 | ||
LU | 02.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
LU | 02.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
LU | 02.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
LU | 02.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 30.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2004241490 (FINLEY JAMES J [US]) [X] 1-5,8,18 * paragraphs [0069] , [0070] , [0077]; figures 1-20; example 7; table 1 * [Y] 6,7,9-17,19,20; | [Y]US2005238923 (THIEL JAMES P [US]) [Y] 6,9-14,16,17,19,20 * paragraphs [0019] , [0031] - [0033]; examples 1,2; tables 2,4 *; | [Y]US2011117300 (WAGNER ANDREW V [US]) [Y] 6,9-14,16,17,19,20 * paragraphs [0039] - [0043] *; | [Y]US2016214887 (ILLY BENOÎT [FR], et al) [Y] 7,15* paragraphs [0008] , [0057] - [0063]; example 1 * | by applicant | US4716086 | US4786563 | US5344718 | US5376455 | US5425861 | WO9529883 | CA2156571 | US5532180 | US5584902 |