EP3668417 - FLOW ATTENUATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arissa Medical, Inc. 39655 Eureka Drive Newark, CA 94560 / US | [2022/40] |
Former [2020/26] | For all designated states Incumedx Inc. 46790 Lakeview Blvd. Fremont, CA 94538 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE, Be, Thi 2522 Buckhill Court San Jose CA 95148 / US | 02 /
CHO, Tae, Hee 3508 Brighton Ave. 1 Oakland CA 94602 / US | 03 /
VELASCO, Regina, Coeli 972 Huntington Terrace Fremont CA 94536 / US | 04 /
GARZA, Armando 530 Locust Street San Jose CA 95110 / US | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 18760183.6 | 10.08.2018 | [2020/26] | WO2018US46263 | Priority number, date | US201762546809P | 17.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762546809 P | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019036298 | Date: | 21.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3668417 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3668417 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12, A61B90/00 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
A61B17/1214 (EP,US);
A61B17/12113 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/12154 (US);
A61B17/12022 (CN);
A61B17/12168 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2/90 (US);
A61L31/146 (US);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,US);
A61B2017/12054 (US);
A61B2090/3966 (EP,US);
A61F2002/823 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRÖMUNGSDÄMPFER | [2020/26] | English: | FLOW ATTENUATION DEVICE | [2020/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ATTÉNUATION D'ÉCOULEMENT | [2020/26] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 31.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22193797.2 / EP4119066 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.10.2022 | AT | 05.10.2022 | CZ | 05.10.2022 | DK | 05.10.2022 | EE | 05.10.2022 | FI | 05.10.2022 | HR | 05.10.2022 | LT | 05.10.2022 | LV | 05.10.2022 | MC | 05.10.2022 | NL | 05.10.2022 | PL | 05.10.2022 | RO | 05.10.2022 | RS | 05.10.2022 | SE | 05.10.2022 | SI | 05.10.2022 | SK | 05.10.2022 | SM | 05.10.2022 | NO | 05.01.2023 | GR | 06.01.2023 | IS | 05.02.2023 | PT | 06.02.2023 | [2024/16] |
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 05.10.2022 | |
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 05.10.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002169473 (SEPETKA IVAN [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0164]; figure 64 *; | [XI]US2009270974 (BEREZ AARON LEE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,12,15 * figure 11A * * paragraph [0221] * [I] 7,10; | [A]WO2011072053 (NEUROVASX INC [US], et al) [A] 1-3,6-15* the whole document *; | [X]GB2494820 (REVERSE MEDICAL CORP [US]) [X] 1,15 * figure 21 *; | [X]US2013261730 (BOSE ARANI [US], et al) [X] 1,13,15 * figures 7,7A,7C *; | [X]US2014128901 (KANG KEVIN [US], et al) [X] 1,13,15 * figure 17B *; | [X]WO2015184075 (STRYKER EUROPE HOLDINGS I LLC [US]) [X] 1,2,15 * figure 17B *; | [X]WO2016014985 (INCUMEDX INC [US]) [X] 1 * figure 7 *; | [XA]EP3087934 (DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,15 * figure 12A * * page 19 * [A] 6-14; | [X]WO2017035275 (NEURVANA MEDICAL LLC [US]) [X] 1,13,15 * figure 5 * | Examination | WO9409705 | WO0007524 | US2006116714 | CN203885667U |