EP3574613 - UNIFIED RESOURCE MANAGEMENT IN A DATA CENTER CLOUD ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, IT | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Luhui Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZANG, Hui Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
HU, Ziang Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/51] |
Former [2019/49] | 01 /
HU, Luhui c/o Futurewei Technologies Inc. 5340 Legacy Drive Suite 175 Plano, Texas 75024 / US | ||
02 /
ZANG, Hui c/o Futurewei Technologies Inc. 5340 Legacy Drive Suite 175 Plano, Texas 75024 / US | |||
03 /
HU, Ziang c/o Futurewei Technologies Inc. 5340 Legacy Drive Suite 175 Plano, Texas 75024 / US | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2022/25] |
Former [2019/49] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18761131.4 | 23.02.2018 | [2019/49] | WO2018CN76994 | Priority number, date | US201715448444 | 02.03.2017 Original published format: US201715448444 | [2019/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018157757 | Date: | 07.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3574613 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3574613 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
H04L67/1097 (EP,US);
G06F9/5061 (EP);
H04L63/083 (EP,US);
H04L63/102 (EP,US);
H04L67/30 (EP,US);
H04L67/1076 (EP);
H04L69/321 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/52] | H04L12/24, G06F9/50 | ||
Former IPC [2019/49] | H04L12/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINHEITLICHE RESSOURCENVERWALTUNG IN EINER CLOUD-ARCHITEKTUR EINES DATENCENTERS | [2019/49] | English: | UNIFIED RESOURCE MANAGEMENT IN A DATA CENTER CLOUD ARCHITECTURE | [2019/49] | French: | GESTION UNIFIÉE DE RESSOURCES DANS UNE ARCHITECTURE EN NUAGE DE CENTRE DE DONNÉES | [2019/49] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 04.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 22.06.2022 | AT | 22.06.2022 | CZ | 22.06.2022 | DK | 22.06.2022 | EE | 22.06.2022 | ES | 22.06.2022 | FI | 22.06.2022 | HR | 22.06.2022 | IT | 22.06.2022 | LT | 22.06.2022 | LV | 22.06.2022 | MC | 22.06.2022 | NL | 22.06.2022 | PL | 22.06.2022 | RO | 22.06.2022 | RS | 22.06.2022 | SE | 22.06.2022 | SI | 22.06.2022 | SK | 22.06.2022 | SM | 22.06.2022 | BG | 22.09.2022 | NO | 22.09.2022 | GR | 23.09.2022 | IS | 22.10.2022 | PT | 24.10.2022 | IE | 23.02.2023 | LU | 23.02.2023 | BE | 28.02.2023 | CH | 28.02.2023 | LI | 28.02.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
IE | 23.02.2023 | ||
LU | 23.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
LU | 23.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US7984151 (RAZ DANNY [US], et al) [X] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]US2015358251 (VARGA JOZSEF [HU], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0060] * * figures 7,8 *; | [X]US2016188594 (RANGANATHAN JAIRAM [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0021] * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0059] *; | [X] - GOSCINSKI A ET AL, "RESOURCE MANAGEMENT IN LARGE DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS", OPERATING SYSTEMS REVIEW, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19901001), vol. 24, no. 4, doi:10.1145/94574.94575, ISSN 0163-5980, pages 7 - 25, XP000273166 [X] 1-15 * section 2.4 * * section 2.5 Hierarchical Resource Management * * figures 1,2,5,7,8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/94574.94575 | International search | [A]CN1988549 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-25* the whole document *; | [X]WO2012165937 (MIMOS BERHAD [MY], et al) [X] 1-25 * the description, page 8, line 4 to page 10, line 9, and claims 1-14 *; | [A]CN105052074 (TEKELEC INC) [A] 1-25 * the whole document * | by applicant | US7984151 | WO2012165937 | US2015358251 | US2016188594 | - GOSCINSKI A et al., "RESOURCE MANAGEMENT IN LARGE DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS", OPERATING SYSTEMS REVIEW, ACM, (19901001), vol. 24, no. 4, doi:10.1145/94574.94575, ISSN 0163-5980, pages 7 - 25, XP000273166 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/94574.94575 |