EP3590891 - ALUMINA-BASED THERMALLY CONDUCTIVE OXIDE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dainichiseika Color & Chemicals Mfg. Co., Ltd. 7-6 Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | [2020/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIO, Akira c/o DAINICHISEIKA COLOR & CHEMICALS Mfg. Co., Ltd. 7-6 Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | 02 /
YAMANE, Kenichi c/o DAINICHISEIKA COLOR & CHEMICALS Mfg. Co., Ltd. 7-6 Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | 03 /
YAMAMURA, Naotsugu c/o DAINICHISEIKA COLOR & CHEMICALS Mfg. Co., Ltd. 7-6 Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | 04 /
TOMINAGA, Shingo c/o DAINICHISEIKA COLOR & CHEMICALS Mfg. Co., Ltd. 7-6 Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | 05 /
ONIDUKA, Hiroya c/o DAINICHISEIKA COLOR & CHEMICALS Mfg. Co., Ltd. 7-6 Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | [2020/02] | Representative(s) | Blodig, Wolfgang Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [2020/02] | Application number, filing date | 18761134.8 | 27.02.2018 | [2020/02] | WO2018JP07251 | Priority number, date | JP20170038977 | 02.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017038977 | [2020/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018159608 | Date: | 07.09.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3590891 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3590891 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C01F7/02, C01B35/04, C01G23/00, C01G29/00, C01G31/02, C01G41/00, C04B35/111, C08K3/22, C08L101/00, C09D7/00, C09D7/40, C09D11/037, C09D201/00, C09J9/00, C09J11/04, C09J201/00, C09K5/14 | [2020/02] | CPC: |
C09D5/00 (EP,US);
C01B35/128 (KR);
C09K5/14 (EP,US);
C01B35/04 (EP);
C01F7/02 (EP);
C01G23/00 (EP);
C01G29/00 (EP);
C01G31/02 (EP);
C01G41/00 (EP);
C04B35/111 (EP);
C08K3/22 (US);
C08K3/26 (US);
C08K3/32 (US);
C08K3/40 (US);
C08L101/00 (EP,KR);
C09D11/037 (EP,KR,US);
C09D11/10 (EP);
C09D11/52 (EP);
C09D201/00 (EP,KR);
C09D7/40 (KR);
C09D7/61 (EP,US);
C09J11/04 (KR,US);
C09J201/00 (EP,KR);
C09J9/00 (KR);
H01L23/3737 (US);
H01L24/29 (US);
C08K2003/2227 (EP,US);
C08K2003/2241 (US);
C08K2003/2258 (US);
C08K2003/2296 (US);
C08K2003/324 (US);
C08K2003/387 (KR);
C08K2201/001 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2224/2929 (US);
H01L2224/29387 (US);
H01L23/3731 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUF ALUMINIUMOXID BASIERENDES WÄRMELEITENDES OXID UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2020/02] | English: | ALUMINA-BASED THERMALLY CONDUCTIVE OXIDE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2020/02] | French: | OXYDE À BASE D'ALUMINE THERMIQUEMENT CONDUCTEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2020/02] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2019 | Translation filed | 18.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 15.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 17.08.2022 | AT | 17.08.2022 | CZ | 17.08.2022 | DK | 17.08.2022 | EE | 17.08.2022 | ES | 17.08.2022 | FI | 17.08.2022 | HR | 17.08.2022 | LT | 17.08.2022 | LV | 17.08.2022 | MC | 17.08.2022 | NL | 17.08.2022 | PL | 17.08.2022 | RO | 17.08.2022 | RS | 17.08.2022 | SE | 17.08.2022 | SI | 17.08.2022 | SK | 17.08.2022 | SM | 17.08.2022 | NO | 17.11.2022 | GR | 18.11.2022 | IS | 17.12.2022 | PT | 19.12.2022 | IE | 27.02.2023 | LU | 27.02.2023 | BE | 28.02.2023 | CH | 28.02.2023 | LI | 28.02.2023 | [2024/12] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
IE | 27.02.2023 | ||
LU | 27.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
LU | 27.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 17.08.2022 | |
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 17.08.2022 | |
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 17.08.2022 | |
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02098796 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 21 * * abstract *; | [X]CN102363577 (ALUMINUM CORP OF CHINA LTD) [X] 1-15 * abstract *; | [X]WO2013039103 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract *; | [X]WO2013084750 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-15* abstract * | International search | [A]JPH07206430 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-18 * , entire text & US 5935550 A1, entire text & CN 1095360 A *; | [A]JP2002348116 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [A] 1-18 * , entire text & US 2005/0035230 A1, entire text & WO 2002/098796 A1 & CN 1463251 A *; | [A]JP2003002642 (KAWAI LIME IND, et al) [A] 1-18 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2003192339 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [A] 1-18 * , entire text & US 2005/0182172 A1, entire text & CN 1692075 A & KR 10-2004-0071265 A *; | [A]JP2003521435 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES COMPANY) [A] 1-18 * , entire text & US 2001/0027623 A1, entire text *; | [A]JP2005022963 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [A] 1-18 * , entire text & US 2006/0189740 A1, entire text & KR 10-2006-0020672 A *; | [A]JP2014218424 (MERCK PATENT GMBH) [A] 1-18* , entire text & US 2014/0322534 A1, entire text & EP 2799397 A2 & CN 104129806 A & KR 10-2014-0130048 A * | by applicant | JPS5720848B | JPS5997528 | JP3744010B | JP2007045876 | JP2007169516 | JP2008127257 | JP2015010200 | JP2015034269 | JP5975182B |