EP3589150 - UPPER AND ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR INCLUDING UPPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Under Armour, Inc. 1020 Hull Street Baltimore, MD 21230 / US | [2020/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBSTER, James 1020 Hull Street Baltimore, MD 21230 / US | 02 /
FOXEN, Thomas 1020 Hull Street Baltimore, MD 21230 / US | 03 /
MCMANUS, David 1020 Hull Street Baltimore, MD 21230 / US | [2020/02] | Representative(s) | Verscht, Thomas Kurt Albert Josephsburgstrasse 88 A 81673 München / DE | [2020/02] | Application number, filing date | 18761178.5 | 28.02.2018 | [2020/02] | WO2018US20151 | Priority number, date | US201762464922P | 28.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762464922 P | [2020/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018160652 | Date: | 07.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3589150 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3589150 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 07.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A43B23/02, A43D3/00, A43B3/00, A43B23/04, A43D3/06, B32B5/02, B32B5/20, B32B5/24, A43D3/02, // A43B5/02, A43B23/26, A43D8/16, A43D100/00, A43D100/04, A43D100/06, B29D35/06, B29D35/12, B29D35/14 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
A43B23/0245 (EP,US);
A43B1/14 (US);
A43B23/0215 (EP,US);
A43B23/0235 (EP,US);
A43B23/025 (US);
A43B23/026 (EP,US);
A43B23/042 (EP,US);
A43B3/0042 (EP);
A43B5/00 (US);
A43B9/00 (US);
A43D11/01 (US);
A43D3/02 (EP,US);
A43D3/026 (EP,US);
B05D1/02 (US);
B32B27/065 (US);
B32B27/40 (US);
B32B3/30 (US);
B32B5/02 (US);
B32B5/022 (EP);
B32B5/024 (EP);
B32B5/026 (EP);
B32B5/18 (US);
B32B5/20 (EP);
B32B5/245 (EP,US);
A43B1/04 (US);
A43B23/0225 (US);
A43B23/0265 (US);
A43B23/087 (US);
A43B23/17 (US);
A43B23/26 (EP,US);
A43B3/0036 (US);
A43B3/0078 (US);
A43B5/02 (US);
A43B5/025 (EP,US);
A43B7/08 (US);
A43B7/144 (US);
A43D100/00 (EP,US);
A43D100/04 (EP,US);
A43D100/06 (EP,US);
A43D8/16 (EP,US);
B29D35/061 (EP,US);
B29D35/126 (EP,US);
B29D35/128 (EP,US);
B29D35/146 (EP,US);
B29K2075/00 (US);
B29K2105/04 (US);
B32B2262/0215 (EP);
B32B2262/0253 (EP);
B32B2262/0261 (EP);
B32B2262/0284 (EP);
B32B2262/0292 (EP);
B32B2262/062 (EP);
B32B2262/08 (EP);
B32B2266/0278 (EP,US);
B32B2266/06 (EP);
B32B2307/724 (EP);
B32B2437/02 (EP,US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/02] | A43B23/02, A43D3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUHOBERTEIL UND SCHUHWERK MIT DEM SCHUHOBERTEIL | [2020/02] | English: | UPPER AND ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR INCLUDING UPPER | [2020/02] | French: | TIGE ET ARTICLE CHAUSSANT COMPRENANT UNE TIGE | [2020/02] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 29.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 27.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2023 | CZ | 10.05.2023 | DK | 10.05.2023 | EE | 10.05.2023 | ES | 10.05.2023 | FI | 10.05.2023 | HR | 10.05.2023 | IT | 10.05.2023 | LT | 10.05.2023 | LV | 10.05.2023 | NL | 10.05.2023 | PL | 10.05.2023 | RO | 10.05.2023 | RS | 10.05.2023 | SE | 10.05.2023 | SI | 10.05.2023 | SK | 10.05.2023 | SM | 10.05.2023 | NO | 10.08.2023 | GR | 11.08.2023 | IS | 10.09.2023 | PT | 11.09.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
PT | 11.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2432174 (ERNST ROLLMANN); | [X]US2789933 (BARGMEYER ERNESG G H); | [Y]US2010199520 (DUA BHUPESH [US], et al); | [XYI]US2011185594 (ZHANG YUEDONG [CN], et al); | [X]WO2016093956 (NIKE INNOVATE CV [US], et al); | [Y]WO2017023524 (NIKE INNOVATE CV [US], et al) | International search | [A]US3106729 (ALBERT KAMBORIAN); | [A]SU1639603 (MO T I LEGKOJ PROMY [SU], et al); | [A]US2008168684 (KHALIFA ALY [US]); | [A]US2016166010 (BRUCE ROBERT M [US], et al) | by applicant | US2432174 | US2789933 | US2011185594 | WO2016093956 |