EP3668866 - PESTICIDAL AND PARASITICIDAL PYRAZOLE-ISOXAZOLINE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Animal Health USA Inc. 3239 Satellite Boulevard, Bldg. 500 Duluth, GA 30096 / US | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LONG, Alan Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 02 /
LEE, Hyoung, Ik Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2023/03] |
Former [2020/26] | 01 /
LONG, Alan 5914 Stuart Drive Flowery Branch GA 30542 / US | ||
02 /
LEE, Hyoung, Ik 10875 Windham Way Alpharetta GA 30022 / US | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/26] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 18762705.4 | 14.08.2018 | [2020/26] | WO2018US46601 | Priority number, date | US201762545308P | 14.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762545308 P | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019036407 | Date: | 21.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3668866 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3668866 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/04, C07D493/10, A01N43/80, A61P33/14, A61P33/00 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
C07D413/04 (EP,US);
A01N43/80 (US);
A01N43/90 (US);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/14 (EP);
C07D491/107 (US);
C07D493/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PESTIZIDE UND PARASITIZIDE PYRAZOLISOXAZOLINVERBINDUNGEN | [2020/26] | English: | PESTICIDAL AND PARASITICIDAL PYRAZOLE-ISOXAZOLINE COMPOUNDS | [2020/26] | French: | COMPOSÉS DE PYRAZOLE-ISOXAZOLINE À ACTIVITÉ PESTICIDE ET PARASITICIDE | [2020/26] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 04.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.01.2023 | CZ | 18.01.2023 | DK | 18.01.2023 | EE | 18.01.2023 | FI | 18.01.2023 | HR | 18.01.2023 | LT | 18.01.2023 | LV | 18.01.2023 | MC | 18.01.2023 | PL | 18.01.2023 | RO | 18.01.2023 | RS | 18.01.2023 | SE | 18.01.2023 | SI | 18.01.2023 | SK | 18.01.2023 | SM | 18.01.2023 | NO | 18.04.2023 | GR | 19.04.2023 | IS | 18.05.2023 | PT | 18.05.2023 | IE | 14.08.2023 | LU | 14.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
CZ | 18.01.2023 | ||
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
MC | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SI | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
IE | 14.08.2023 | ||
LU | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
CZ | 18.01.2023 | ||
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
MC | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SI | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
LU | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
CZ | 18.01.2023 | ||
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
MC | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SI | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
CZ | 18.01.2023 | ||
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SI | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
CZ | 18.01.2023 | ||
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
CZ | 18.01.2023 | ||
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 18.01.2023 | |
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 18.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XDI]EP1731512 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [XD] 1-3 * Compounds od formula G-17a and G-19a (on page 195). See also pages 209-210 for specific examples of these compounds;; claims 1,9 * [I] 1-19; | [AD]WO2007070606 (DU PONT [US], et al) [AD] 1-19 * claims 1,7 *; | [AD]WO2007079162 (DU PONT [US], et al) [AD] 1-19 * claims 1,10 *; | [AD]WO2007123855 (DU PONT [US], et al) [AD] 1-19* claims 1,8 *; | [ID]EP1932836 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [ID] 1-19 * claims 1,14 *; | [ID]EP1997813 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [ID] 1-19 * claims 1,7 *; | [XI]EP2186804 (NIPPON SODA CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,14-19 * page 34; claims 1,8-10; compounds 1-145 * [I] 1-19; | [X]US2013023526 (CALDERWOOD DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,14-19 * page 147 - page 149; claim 1; compounds G1.135, G1.155 *; | [I] - P V BADADHE, "Synthesis and characterization of some novel isoxazolines and pyrazolines as potent antimicrobial agents", INDIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, SECTION B, (20110401), vol. 50B, pages 879 - 884, XP055509752 [I] 1-19 * compounds 4a-4h * | by applicant | US3748356 | US3818047 | GB1390336 | US3950360 | US4134973 | EP0002916 | US4166452 | EP0007812 | US4199569 | US4225598 | US4256108 | US4265874 | US4310519 | US4427663 | US4468390 | GB2140010 | US4564631 | EP0179022 | US4742060 | US4751225 | US4798837 | US4855317 | US4859657 | US4871719 | US4874749 | US4920148 | US4963582 | US4973711 | US4978677 | WO9109961 | US5055596 | US5077308 | WO9222555 | NZ237086 | US5399582 | EP0667054 | EP0677054 | WO9703988 | US5703078 | US5750695 | US5824653 | EP0892060 | US5962499 | US6001384 | US6010710 | US6083519 | US6096329 | US6174540 | US6221894 | WO0176370 | US6395765 | US6399786 | US6426333 | US6685954 | WO2004024704 | US6787342 | US6998131 | US7001889 | US7001903 | US7012041 | US7084280 | WO2007070606 | WO2007075459 | WO2007079162 | WO2007123855 | WO2007125984 | US7365082 | US7420062 | US2008234331 | US7432226 | WO2008154528 | WO2009002809 | WO2009004432 | US2009143410 | WO2010003923 | US7662972 | US2010069247 | US2010137372 | US2010137612 | US2010179194 | US2010179195 | US2010254960 | US2010254959 | US7897630 | US2011059988 | US2011086886 | US2011118212 | US7947715 | US7951828 | US2011144349 | US7964204 | US7964621 | US2011152312 | US2011152081 | US2011159107 | US2011166193 | WO2011104088 | WO2011104087 | WO2011104089 | US2011245274 | US2011245239 | US2011251247 | US8053452 | WO2011149749 | WO2011154433 | WO2011154434 | WO2011157748 | US8088801 | US2012015946 | US2012030841 | US2012035122 | US8119671 | US2012077765 | WO2012086462 | WO2012089623 | WO2012089622 | US8217180 | WO2012107533 | WO2012120399 | WO2012120135 | US2012232026 | US2012238517 | US8318757 | US2012309620 | US8383659 | WO2013039948 | US8410153 | US8466115 | WO2013119442 | US8546613 | US8618126 | WO2014039475 | WO2014039484 | WO2014090918 | US8853186 | WO2014189837 | US2014371464 | US2015291612 | - WINNACKER-KUCHLER, Chemische Technologie'' [Chemical Technology, C. Hauser Verlag, (19860000), vol. 7 | - WATKINS, Handbook of Insecticide Dust Diluents and Carriers, Darland Books | - H.V. OLPHEN, Introduction to Clay Colloid Chemistry, J. Wiley & Sons | - MCCUTCHEON'S, Detergents and Emulsifiers Annual, MC Publ. Corp. | - J.E. BROWNING, "Agglomeration", Chemical and Engineering, (19670000), page 147 | - Perry's Chemical Engineer's Handbook, McGraw-Hill, (19730000), pages 8 - 57 | - ALBERS-SCHONBERG et al., "Avermectins Structure Determination", J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19810000), vol. 103, pages 4216 - 4221 | - Veterinary Parasitology, (19930700), vol. 49, no. 1, pages 5 - 15 | - DAVIES H.G. et al., "Avermectins and Milbemycins", Nat. Prod. Rep., (19860000), vol. 3, pages 87 - 121 | - MROZIK H. et al., "Synthesis of Milbemycins from Avermectins", Tetrahedron Lett., (19830000), vol. 24, doi:doi:10.1016/S0040-4039(00)87861-2, pages 5333 - 5336, XP085658302 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)87861-2 | - "International Nonproprietary Names for Pharmaceutical Substances (INN", WHO Drug Information, (20030000), vol. 17, no. 4, pages 263 - 286 | - WILLSON et al., Parasitology, (20030100), vol. 126, pages 79 - 86 | - SAGER et al., Veterinary Parasitology, (20090000), vol. 159, pages 49 - 54 | - KAMINSKY et al., Nature, (20080313), vol. 452, pages 176 - 181 | - OSTLIND et al., Research in Veterinary Science, (19900000), vol. 48, pages 260 - 61 | - OSTLIND et al., Medical and Veterinary Entomology, (19970000), vol. 11, pages 407 - 408 | - Tet. Lett., (19810000), vol. 22, page 135 | - J. Antibiotics, (19900000), vol. 43, page 1380 | - J. Antibiotics, (19910000), vol. 44, page 492 | - J. Chem. Soc. - Chem. Comm., (19800000), page 601 | - Tet. Lett., (19810000), vol. 22, page 1977 |