EP3594764 - MACHINING CENTER NC OPERATING PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kitamura Machinery Co., Ltd. 1870 Toide Komyoji Takaoka-shi, Toyama 939-1192 / JP | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAMURA Akihiro c/o KITAMURA MACHINERY CO. LTD. 1870 Toide Komyoji Takaoka-shi Toyama 939-1192 / JP | 02 /
KITAMURA Kosaku c/o KITAMURA MACHINERY CO. LTD. 1870 Toide Komyoji Takaoka-shi Toyama 939-1192 / JP | 03 /
ASANO Takashi c/o KITAMURA MACHINERY CO. LTD. 1870 Toide Komyoji Takaoka-shi Toyama 939-1192 / JP | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/03] | Application number, filing date | 18764592.4 | 02.03.2018 | [2020/03] | WO2018JP08027 | Priority number, date | JP20170041810 | 06.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017041810 | [2020/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018163992 | Date: | 13.09.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3594764 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/409, G05B19/18, G06F21/32 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
G05B19/409 (EP,US);
G05B19/18 (EP);
G06F21/32 (EP);
G06V40/166 (US);
G06V40/172 (US);
G05B2219/24162 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/03] | G05B19/409, G05B19/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] | Title | German: | BEDIENFELD FÜR NUMERISCH GESTEUERTE BEARBEITUNGSZENTREN | [2020/03] | English: | MACHINING CENTER NC OPERATING PANEL | [2020/03] | French: | TABLEAU DE COMMANDE DE CENTRE D'USINAGE À COMMANDE NUMÉRIQUE | [2020/03] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2019 | Translation filed | 06.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/03] | 04.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]TW201245917 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]WO2015052419 (SIDEL PARTICIPATIONS [FR]); | [A]US2015273704 (INABA RYOUTAROU [JP], et al) | International search | [A]JP2004167669 (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * , *; | [A]JP2007272486 (IDEC CORP) [A] 1-3* , *; | [A]JP2007329284 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD) [A] 1-3 * , *; | [X]JP2014063423 (DISCO ABRASIVE SYSTEMS LTD) [X] 1-3 * , * | by applicant | JP20010202108 | JP20040243472 | JP20070272486 | JP20160156193 |