EP3700788 - AXLE VALVE MODULE AND RELAY VALVE MODULE FOR A PNEUMATIC BRAKE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/36] | AXLE VALVE MODULE AND RELAY VALVE MODULE OF A COMPRESSED AIR BRAKING SYSTEM | ||
[2022/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF CV Systems Europe BV Chaussée de la Hulpe 166 1170 Brussels / BE | [2022/08] |
Former [2021/21] | For all designated states ZF CV Systems Hannover GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2020/36] | For all designated states WABCO GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIALON, Rafal Kwiatowa 17 Godzikowice 55-200 Olawa / PL | 02 /
OTREMBA, Robert Meiergarten 10 30952 Ronnenberg / DE | 03 /
SCHMIDT, Detlef Wagnerweg 5 30989 Gehrden / DE | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Rabe, Dirk-Heinrich ZF CV Systems Hannover GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | [2023/19] |
Former [2020/36] | Rabe, Dirk-Heinrich Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 18766171.5 | 03.09.2018 | [2020/36] | WO2018EP73624 | Priority number, date | DE20171009954 | 26.10.2017 Original published format: DE102017009954 | [2020/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019081101 | Date: | 02.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3700788 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3700788 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/68, B60T8/32, B60T8/36, B60T8/48 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
B60T13/683 (EP,US);
B60T8/327 (EP);
B60T8/361 (EP,US);
B60T2270/10 (US);
B60T8/4818 (EP,US);
B60Y2400/81 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ACHSVENTILMODUL UND RELAISVENTILMODUL EINER DRUCKLUFTBREMSANLAGE | [2020/36] | English: | AXLE VALVE MODULE AND RELAY VALVE MODULE FOR A PNEUMATIC BRAKE SYSTEM | [2022/34] | French: | MODULE DE SOUPAPES D'ESSIEU ET MODULE DE SOUPAPE RELAIS POUR UN SYSTÈME DE FREINS PNEUMATIQUE | [2022/34] |
Former [2020/36] | AXLE VALVE MODULE AND RELAY VALVE MODULE OF A COMPRESSED AIR BRAKING SYSTEM | ||
Former [2020/36] | MODULE DE VANNE D'ESSIEU ET MODULE DE VANNE RELAIS D'UN SYSTÈME DE FREINAGE PNEUMATIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 26.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 10.05.2023 | DK | 10.05.2023 | EE | 10.05.2023 | ES | 10.05.2023 | FI | 10.05.2023 | HR | 10.05.2023 | IT | 10.05.2023 | LT | 10.05.2023 | LV | 10.05.2023 | MC | 10.05.2023 | NL | 10.05.2023 | PL | 10.05.2023 | RO | 10.05.2023 | RS | 10.05.2023 | SE | 10.05.2023 | SI | 10.05.2023 | SK | 10.05.2023 | SM | 10.05.2023 | NO | 10.08.2023 | GR | 11.08.2023 | IE | 03.09.2023 | LU | 03.09.2023 | IS | 10.09.2023 | PT | 11.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | CZ | 10.05.2023 | |
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
IT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IE | 03.09.2023 | ||
LU | 03.09.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
CH | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 10.05.2023 | |
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
IT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IE | 03.09.2023 | ||
LU | 03.09.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 10.05.2023 | |
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
IT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
LU | 03.09.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 10.05.2023 | |
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
IT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
LU | 03.09.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | CZ | 10.05.2023 | |
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
LU | 03.09.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | CZ | 10.05.2023 | |
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 10.05.2023 | |
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
PT | 11.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH01220787 (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE FAHRZEUG) [A] 1,7 * abstract ** figure 2 *; | [XI]EP0547407 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 7,8,10,12 * claim 1 * * figure 1 * * columns 2-5 * [I] 1-6,9,11; | [A]EP0616931 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,7 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [AD]EP1826085 (MERITOR WABCO VEHICLE CONTROL [US]) [AD] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1826085 | DE102014012596 | DE102014012712 |