EP3595530 - X-RAY IMAGING APPARATUS AND PATIENT SUPPORT ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Planmeca Oy Asentajankatu 6 00880 Helsinki / FI | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JARVA, Mikko c/o Planmeca Oy Asentajankatu 6 00880 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
MALMÉN, Kari c/o Planmeca Oy Asentajankatu 6 00880 Helsinki / FI | 03 /
SEPPÄLÄ, Lauri c/o Planmeca Oy Asentajankatu 6 00880 Helsinki / FI | 04 /
PIHLAJAMÄKI, Tero c/o Planmeca Oy Asentajankatu 6 00880 Helsinki / FI | 05 /
HYVÄRINEN, Pentti c/o Planmeca Oy Asentajankatu 6 00880 Helsinki / FI | 06 /
MÜLLER, Timo c/o Planmeca Oy Asentajankatu 6 00880 Helsinki / FI | [2020/04] | Application number, filing date | 18766643.3 | 19.03.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018FI50201 | Priority number, date | FI20170005245 | 17.03.2017 Original published format: FI 20175245 | [2020/04] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018167378 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3595530 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3595530 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 20.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/04, A61B6/14, A61B6/00, A61B6/10 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
A61B6/04 (EP,FI,KR,RU,US);
A61B6/032 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61B6/0421 (EP,RU);
A61B6/102 (FI,KR,RU);
A61B6/501 (FI,KR,RU,US);
A61B6/51 (EP,FI,KR,RU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RÖNTGENBILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND PATIENTENLIEGEANORDNUNG | [2020/04] | English: | X-RAY IMAGING APPARATUS AND PATIENT SUPPORT ARRANGEMENT | [2020/04] | French: | APPAREIL D'IMAGERIE PAR RAYONS X ET AGENCEMENT DE SUPPORT DE PATIENT | [2020/04] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 06.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH07307U ; | [Y]US2005277086 (ARAI YOSHINORI [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2010214023 (YOSHIDA SEISAKUSHO KK); | [XYI]JP2014097094 (HYOGO PREFECTURE SOCIAL WELFARE CORP, et al) | International search | [A]WO2004082481 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP [JP], et al); | [A]WO2011104439 (PLANMECA OY [FI], et al); | [A]KR20160072902 (OSSTEM IMPLANT CO LTD [KR]) | Examination | JP2000201924 | JP2005137597 |