EP3598430 - ELECTRIC GUITAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/04] | BODY OF ELECTRIC GUITAR AND ELECTRIC GUITAR | ||
[2022/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIZAKA, Kenta YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1 Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/04] | Application number, filing date | 18766858.7 | 09.03.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018JP09222 | Priority number, date | JP20170050528 | 15.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017050528 | [2020/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018168690 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3598430 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3598430 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G10D1/08, // G10D3/02 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
G10D1/085 (EP,US);
G10D3/02 (EP);
G10H3/181 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/04] | G10D3/02, G10D1/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE GITARRE | [2022/42] | English: | ELECTRIC GUITAR | [2022/42] | French: | GUITARE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2022/42] |
Former [2020/04] | KÖRPER EINER ELEKTRISCHEN GITARRE UND ELEKTRISCHE GITARRE | ||
Former [2020/04] | BODY OF ELECTRIC GUITAR AND ELECTRIC GUITAR | ||
Former [2020/04] | CORPS DE GUITARE ÉLECTRIQUE ET GUITARE ÉLECTRIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2019 | Translation filed | 09.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 09.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 09.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.04.2023 | AT | 12.04.2023 | CZ | 12.04.2023 | DK | 12.04.2023 | EE | 12.04.2023 | ES | 12.04.2023 | FI | 12.04.2023 | HR | 12.04.2023 | IT | 12.04.2023 | LT | 12.04.2023 | LV | 12.04.2023 | NL | 12.04.2023 | PL | 12.04.2023 | RO | 12.04.2023 | RS | 12.04.2023 | SE | 12.04.2023 | SI | 12.04.2023 | SK | 12.04.2023 | SM | 12.04.2023 | NO | 12.07.2023 | GR | 13.07.2023 | IS | 12.08.2023 | PT | 14.08.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 12.04.2023 | |
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 12.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4334452 (MORRISON III WHITE H, et al) [Y] 3 * figures 1, 4 *; | [XYI]US4919029 (EXCELLENTE RICHARD [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8 * column 4, lines 9-11; figures 1-6; claim 1 * [Y] 3,6 [I] 5; | [Y]US5052269 (YOUNG JR LAWRENCE P [US]) [Y] 6* figure 1 * | International search | [A]US5353672 (STEWART LELAND W [US]) [A] 1-8* , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [XA]US5767432 (RANDOLPH JAMES B [US]) [X] 1, 3, 8 * , fig. 1, column 3, line 49 to column 4, line 5 (Family: none) * [A] 2, 4-7; | [A]JP2001356758 (YAMAHA CORP) [A] 1-8 * , entire text, all drawings & US 2001/0052281 A1 & EP 1164573 A2 *; | [A]US2004060417 (JANES RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * , entire text, all drawings & WO 2004/029924 A2 *; | [A]US2013298751 (JUSZKIEWICZ HENRY E [US]) [A] 1-8 * , entire text, all drawings & WO 2012/058631 A1 & EP 2633518 A4 *; | [A]WO2016094540 (AUSTIN ROBERT BARNES [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * , entire text, all drawings & US 2016/0379607 A1 & EP 3230975 A1 & KR 10-2017-0118694 A & CN 107430844 A * | Examination | US3302507 | US4741238 | by applicant | US4829870 | JP2017050528 |