EP3596255 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TREATING LENSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plasmatica Ltd. 4 Harishonim 6099100 Moshav Bnei Atarot / IL | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAM, Amnon D.N Hevel Megiddo 1922500 Kibbutz Givat Oz / IL | 02 /
SAGIV, Adam 4 Ha-Rishonim Rd. 6099100 Bnei Atarot / IL | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP The Gridiron Building One Pancras Square London N1C 4AG / GB | [2020/04] | Application number, filing date | 18767069.0 | 15.03.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018IL50304 | Priority number, date | US201762471450P | 15.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762471450 P | [2020/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018167792 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3596255 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3596255 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 20.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H05H1/24, H01J37/32 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
H01J37/32348 (EP,US);
H05H1/46 (US);
H01J37/32403 (EP,US);
H05H1/2406 (EP,US);
H05H1/466 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/04] | C23C16/50, C23C16/44, H01J37/32, H05H1/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON LINSEN | [2020/04] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TREATING LENSES | [2020/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE LENTILLES | [2020/04] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: IL | 09.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 16.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23214350.3 / EP4379768 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 06.12.2023 | LT | 06.12.2023 | LV | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | HR | 06.12.2023 | |
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.12.2023 | |
BG | 06.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4245154 (UEHARA AKIRA, et al); | [Y]JPS5924825 (TOYO CONTACT LENS CO LTD); | [A]US5211759 (ZIMMERMANN HEINRICH [CH], et al); | [A]GB2286200 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]); | [XYI]CN105204180 (JIANGSU SIGO OPTICAL CO LTD) | International search | [XY]US4827870 (LEE JAMES C [US]); | [XY]US5009920 (LEE JAMES C [US]); | [XY]GB2286200 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]); | [A]US2005045589 (RASTOGI SANJAY [US], et al); | [Y]US2007078245 (HOFFMAN WILLIAM C [US]); | [Y]EP1867683 (MENICON CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP2115499 (NOVARTIS AG [CH]) |