EP3596082 - CDPK1 INHIBITORS, COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS RELATED THERETO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vyera Pharmaceuticals, LLC 600 Third Avenue, 10th Floor New York, NY 10016 / US | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOPPER, Allen, T. 75 Adams St. Lexington MA 02420 / US | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/04] | HGF Limited 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 18767756.2 | 15.03.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018US22595 | Priority number, date | US201762471795P | 15.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762471795 P | [2020/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018170236 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3596082 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 20.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61K31/519, A61P33/02, A61P31/06 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
A61P31/06 (EP);
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
A61P33/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Title | German: | CDPK1-INHIBITOREN, ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN IM ZUSAMMENHANG DAMIT | [2020/04] | English: | CDPK1 INHIBITORS, COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS RELATED THERETO | [2020/04] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE CDPK1, COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2020/04] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 20.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 08.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/07] | 11.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - THERESA B. KUHLENSCHMIDT ET AL, "ABSTRACT", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, US, (20151109), vol. 60, no. 1, doi:10.1128/AAC.01915-15, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 570 - 579, XP055695132 [X] 1,2,4,9-11,14,15 * page 572; compound 5 * * page 573; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AAC.01915-15 | International search | [X]WO2009062118 (FOLDRX PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-8, 10, 11, 14-19, 27, 28, 33 * Compounds 73, 74, 77, 113, 221, 228, 253 and 314. *; | [X]US2012077827 (IBRAHIM PRABHA N [US], et al) [X] 1-4, 6-8, 14-18, 27, 28, 33 * Compounds la-lc, 2a-2d, 3a-3d, 4a-4d and more. *; | [X]WO2006068760 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1, 2, 4, 6, 14, 16, 18, 27 * Compound 63 *; | [X]WO2010045542 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1, 2, 4, 6, 14, 16, 18, 27 * Intermediate compounds on page 59 lines 22-23 and 26-27, as well as final products BB9 and BB 10/cmpd3. *; | [X]WO2011153553 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1, 2, 4, 6, 14, 16, 18, 27, 28, 33 * Example 28, compounds 38 and 17. *; | [X]WO2013010136 (PHARMACYCLICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4, 10, 14, 16-18, 27 * Page 64 and more. *; | [X]US2013018040 (VAN VOORHIS WESLEY C [US], et al) [X] 1-37 * See [0008], [0233], [0617]-[0619], formulae (lb), (IIc) and (He), compounds 5f (page 30) and 13 (page 38), *; | [X] - OKUZUMI T et al., "Synthesis and evaluation of indazole based analog sensitive Akt inhibitors", Molecular Biosystems, (20100628), vol. 6, no. 8, pages 1389 - 1402, XP055543009 [X] 1, 2, 4, 6-8, 14, 16, 18, 27 * Compound Xli. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c003917a | [Y] - LOURIDO S et al., "Optimizing small molecule inhibitors of calcium-dependent protein kinase 1 to prevent infection by Toxoplasma gondii", Journal of medicinal chemistry, (20130326), vol. 56, no. 7, pages 3068 - 3077, XP055479238 [Y] 1-37 * Whole document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm4001314 |