EP3597631 - COMPLEX CRYSTAL AND CHEMOSENSOR PROVIDED WITH SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Holdings Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2022/23] |
Former [2020/04] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006 Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSOKAWA, Teppei c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
TOHNAI, Norimitsu c/o Osaka University 1-1, Yamadaoka Suita-shi Osaka 565-0871 / JP | 03 /
NISHITANI, Mikihiko c/o Osaka University 1-1, Yamadaoka Suita-shi Osaka 565-0871 / JP | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2020/04] | Application number, filing date | 18768431.1 | 15.03.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018JP10344 | Priority number, date | JP20170051795 | 16.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017051795 | [2020/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018169023 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3597631 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07C255/42, B01D53/14, B01J20/22, B01J20/30, C07C211/27, C09K11/06, G01N21/64, G01N27/00, G01N27/04, C07C217/58, C07D209/82, C07D213/38, C07D213/74, C07D241/48, C07D265/38, C07D279/26, C07D307/52, C07D333/20, C07D333/36 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
C07C211/27 (EP,US);
C07D279/22 (US);
B01D53/14 (EP,US);
B01J20/22 (EP,US);
B01J20/30 (EP,US);
C07C217/58 (EP);
C07C255/42 (EP,US);
C07D209/82 (EP);
C07D209/86 (US);
C07D213/38 (EP,US);
C07D213/74 (EP);
C07D241/48 (EP);
C07D265/38 (EP);
C07D279/26 (EP);
C07D307/52 (EP);
C07D333/20 (EP,US);
C07D333/36 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/04] | C07C255/42, B01D53/14, B01J20/22, B01J20/30, C07C211/27, C09K11/06, G01N21/64, G01N27/00, G01N27/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Title | German: | KOMPLEXER KRISTALL UND DAMIT AUSGESTATTETER CHEMOSENSOR | [2020/04] | English: | COMPLEX CRYSTAL AND CHEMOSENSOR PROVIDED WITH SAME | [2020/04] | French: | CRISTAL COMPLEXE ET CAPTEUR CHIMIQUE ÉQUIPÉ DE CELUI-CI | [2020/04] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2019 | Translation filed | 16.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 12.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 15.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPH02254425 [ ] (TEIJIN LTD); | [X] - TAKEYA, YUTAKA ET AL, "Organic nonlinear optical material", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1991:418282, URL: STN, XP002797285 [X] 1,2,4,6 * abstract * * CAS RN: 134250-51-4 * | [A] - SAVARIMUTHU PHILIP ANTHONY ET AL, "Impact of molecular structure on intermolecular interactions and organic solid state luminescence in supramolecular systems", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL ORGANIC CHEMISTRY., GB, (20101101), vol. 23, no. 11, doi:10.1002/poc.1757, ISSN 0894-3230, pages 1074 - 1079, XP055663685 [A] 1-8 * figures 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/poc.1757 | International search | [A]JPH02254425 (TEIJIN LTD) [A] 1-9 * , claims, examples (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2015193563 (PANASONIC CORP) [A] 1-9 * , claims, examples (Family: none) *; | [A] - AMAMOTO, ATSUSHI et al., "Hierarchical construction of fluorescent organic porous structures and guest responsive fluorescent modulation by ammonium carboxylates", Organic Crystal Group Newsletter, (20110101), vol. 29, page 59, XP055636634 [A] 1-9 | [A] - HARIHARAN, P. S. et al., "Molecular engineering of triphenylamine based aggregation enhanced emissive fluorophore: structure-dependent mechanochromism and self-reversible fluorescence switching", Crystal Growth & Design, (20161121), vol. 17, no. 1, pages 146 - 155, XP055558578 [A] 1-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.cgd.6b01363 | by applicant | JP2009236607 | WO2011148774 | JP2015193563 |