EP3678915 - CORNER CONNECTION FOR SUPPORTING ELEMENTS OF A CABLEWAY CABIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ropetrans AG Birkenstrasse 47 6343 Rotkreuz / CH | [2021/34] |
Former [2020/29] | For all designated states Cwa Constructions Sa Bornfeldstrasse 6 4601 Olten / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUCHS, Christoph Waldruhstrasse 4 6103 Schwarzenberg / CH | [2020/29] | Representative(s) | Liebetanz, Michael Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [2022/13] |
Former [2020/29] | Braun, André jr. Braunpat Braun Eder AG Holeestrasse 87 4054 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 18769950.9 | 05.09.2018 | [2020/29] | WO2018EP73892 | Priority number, date | CH20170001108 | 06.09.2017 Original published format: CH 11082017 | [2020/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019048494 | Date: | 14.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3678915 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3678915 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B61B12/00, F16B7/04, F16B11/00 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
B61B12/002 (EP,CH,US);
F16B9/01 (US);
B61D17/043 (US);
F16B11/008 (EP,CH,US);
F16B7/0446 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ECKVERBINDUNG FÜR TRAGELEMENTE EINER SEILBAHNKABINE | [2020/29] | English: | CORNER CONNECTION FOR SUPPORTING ELEMENTS OF A CABLEWAY CABIN | [2020/29] | French: | RACCORDEMENT D'ANGLE POUR ÉLÉMENTS DE SUPPORT D'UNE CABINE DE TÉLÉPHÉRIQUE | [2020/29] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/29] | 06.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.09.2018 | AL | 30.03.2022 | CY | 30.03.2022 | DK | 30.03.2022 | EE | 30.03.2022 | HR | 30.03.2022 | LT | 30.03.2022 | LV | 30.03.2022 | MC | 30.03.2022 | MK | 30.03.2022 | MT | 30.03.2022 | RO | 30.03.2022 | RS | 30.03.2022 | SM | 30.03.2022 | BG | 30.06.2022 | GR | 01.07.2022 | IS | 30.07.2022 | PT | 01.08.2022 | IE | 05.09.2022 | LU | 05.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 05.09.2018 | |
AL | 30.03.2022 | ||
CY | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
MK | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
IE | 05.09.2022 | ||
LU | 05.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HU | 05.09.2018 | |
AL | 30.03.2022 | ||
CY | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
IE | 05.09.2022 | ||
LU | 05.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
CY | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
IE | 05.09.2022 | ||
LU | 05.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
IE | 05.09.2022 | ||
LU | 05.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
IE | 05.09.2022 | ||
LU | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
LU | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | EE | 30.03.2022 | |
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | EE | 30.03.2022 | |
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | EE | 30.03.2022 | |
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | HR | 30.03.2022 | |
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 30.03.2022 | |
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 30.03.2022 | |
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 30.03.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]CH626842 (FRECH ANTON [CH]) [A] 1-12 * page 3, line 4 - page 5, line 60; figures 1-7 *; | [A]WO8404283 (CWA CONST SA [CH]) [A] 1-12* page 6, line 34 - page 17, line 34; figures 1-11 *; | [Y]DE19929057 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * column 3, line 15 - column 6, line 40; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]EP1619099 (CWA CONST SA [CH]) [Y] 1-12 * column 1, paragraph 0005 - column 3, paragraph 0009; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]DE102014014768 (KOSAK PETRA SABINE [DE]) [A] 1-12 * page 1, paragraph 0013 - page 2, paragraph 0019; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE102015015895 (KOSAK ADRIAN [DE]) [A] 1-12 * page 1, paragraph 0012 - page 2, paragraph 0016; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | CH626842 | EP1619099 |