EP3678512 - JOINING AND LEVELLING SYSTEM FOR PARTS OF FURNITURE AND FURNISHING ITEMS WITH THE SHOULDER ON THE FLOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leonardo S.r.L. Via Leopardi 8 22060 Figino Serenza (CO) / IT | [2020/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CATTANEO, Carlo Via Leonardo da Vinci 5 22060 Figino Serenza (CO) / IT | [2020/29] | Representative(s) | Dragotti & Associati S.R.L. Via Nino Bixio, 7 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2020/29] | Martegani, Franco, et al Franco Martegani S.r.l. Via Carlo Alberto, 41 20900 Monza / IT | Application number, filing date | 18770092.7 | 31.08.2018 | [2020/29] | WO2018IB56673 | Priority number, date | IT20170100709 | 08.09.2017 Original published format: IT201700100709 | [2020/29] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019049008 | Date: | 14.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3678512 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A47B91/00, A47B91/02, F16B12/20 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
F16B12/2063 (EP,US);
A47B91/022 (EP,US);
A47B91/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/29] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGS- UND NIVELLIERSYSTEM FÜR MÖBELTEILE UND MÖBELARTIKEL MIT DER SCHULTER AUF DEM BODEN | [2020/29] | English: | JOINING AND LEVELLING SYSTEM FOR PARTS OF FURNITURE AND FURNISHING ITEMS WITH THE SHOULDER ON THE FLOOR | [2020/29] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ASSEMBLAGE ET DE NIVELAGE POUR MEUBLES ET DES ARTICLES D'AMEUBLEMENT AVEC L'ÉPAULEMENT SUR LE SOL | [2020/29] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/29] | 26.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 13.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO9203663 (TITUS INT LTD [GB]); | [A]JP2002085176 (SYSTEC KYOWA KK); | [A]WO2005115199 (LEONARDO SRL [IT], et al); | [A]EP2653068 (LEONARDO SRL [IT]) |