EP3600428 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR NUCLEIC ACID EXPRESSION IN VIVO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dnarx 235 Berry St. 610 San Francisco, California 94158 / US | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEBS, Robert James 235 Berry St. 610 San Francisco California 94158 / US | 02 /
HEATH, Timothy D. 235 Berry St. 610 San Francisco California 94158 / US | 03 /
HANDUMRONGKUL, Chakkrapong 235 Berry St. 610 San Francisco California 94158 / US | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18770192.5 | 23.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018US24096 | Priority number, date | US201762475477P | 23.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762475477 P | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018175932 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3600428 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/00, A61K47/68, A61K9/00, A61K9/127, A61K39/00, A61K31/7105, C07K16/24, C07K16/28, C07K16/40, C12N5/10, C07K16/10 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
A61K31/7105 (EP,CN,US);
A61K48/005 (CN,US);
A61K31/573 (CN);
A61K31/713 (CN);
A61K39/39558 (CN,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,CN,US);
A61K9/127 (EP,CN,US);
A61K9/1272 (EP,CN,US);
C07K16/1018 (EP,CN,US);
C07K16/244 (EP,CN);
C07K16/247 (EP,CN);
C07K16/2887 (EP,CN);
C07K16/40 (EP,CN,US);
C12N15/102 (EP,CN,US);
C12N15/85 (CN,US);
C12N15/87 (EP,CN,US);
C12N15/88 (CN,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,CN,US);
A61K2039/507 (EP,CN,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,CN,US);
A61K2039/55561 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2317/10 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2317/14 (EP,CN);
C07K2317/76 (EP,CN,US);
C12N2310/20 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/573, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K31/7105, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K31/713, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K39/39558, A61K2300/00 (CN) |
Former IPC [2020/06] | A61K45/00, A61K47/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR IN-VIVO-NUKLEINSÄUREEXPRESSION | [2020/06] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR NUCLEIC ACID EXPRESSION IN VIVO | [2020/06] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET MÉTHODES POUR L'EXPRESSION D'ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES IN VIVO | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 20.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 08.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.11.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 01.11.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.11.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN101812177 (UNIV CHINA PHARMA); | [A]CN102366411 (HAINAN LINGKANG PHARMACEUTICAL); | [X]EP2061514 (COUNCIL SCIENT IND RES [IN]); | [XP]WO2017049132 (DNARX [US]); | International search | [Y]US6074667 (KINNUNEN PAAVO [FI], et al); | [Y]US2006160184 (MATTHEUS HOOGENBOOM HENDRICUS [NL], et al); | [Y]US2007003521 (YEW NELSON [US]); | [Y]US2009252713 (SOUBRIER FABIENNE [FR]); | [Y]WO2016028682 (BROAD INST INC [US], et al); |