EP3605607 - IMAGING ELEMENT AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, IT | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Semiconductor Solutions Corporation 4-14-1, Asahi-cho Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAGAI Yoshimichi c/o SONY SEMICONDUCTOR SOLUTIONS CORPORATION 4-14-1 Asahi-cho Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP | 02 /
ABE Takashi c/o SONY SEMICONDUCTOR SOLUTIONS CORPORATION 4-14-1 Asahi-cho Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP | 03 /
YOSHITA Ryoto c/o SONY SEMICONDUCTOR SOLUTIONS CORPORATION 4-14-1 Asahi-cho Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB Amalienstraße 62 80799 München / DE | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18770204.8 | 09.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018JP09144 | Priority number, date | JP20170055309 | 22.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017055309 | [2020/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018173788 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3605607 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3605607 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146, H04N5/225, H04N5/374 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
H01L27/14623 (EP,CN,KR);
H01L27/14818 (US);
H01L27/14612 (KR);
H01L27/1464 (KR);
H01L27/14643 (CN);
H04N25/76 (CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDGEBUNGSELEMENT UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2020/06] | English: | IMAGING ELEMENT AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2020/06] | French: | ÉLÉMENT D'IMAGERIE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2019 | Translation filed | 11.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 15.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 01.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP22178935.7 / EP4086963 | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 13.07.2022 | AT | 13.07.2022 | CZ | 13.07.2022 | DK | 13.07.2022 | EE | 13.07.2022 | ES | 13.07.2022 | FI | 13.07.2022 | HR | 13.07.2022 | IT | 13.07.2022 | LT | 13.07.2022 | LV | 13.07.2022 | MC | 13.07.2022 | PL | 13.07.2022 | RO | 13.07.2022 | RS | 13.07.2022 | SE | 13.07.2022 | SI | 13.07.2022 | SK | 13.07.2022 | SM | 13.07.2022 | NO | 13.10.2022 | GR | 14.10.2022 | IS | 13.11.2022 | PT | 14.11.2022 | IE | 09.03.2023 | LU | 09.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/09] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
IE | 09.03.2023 | ||
LU | 09.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
IE | 09.03.2023 | ||
LU | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 13.07.2022 | |
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2012012965 (MAEDA MOTOHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,6,9-15 * paragraphs [0018] - [0061]; figures 1-8 * [Y] 7,8 [I] 4; | [Y]US2015181187 (WU DONGHUI [US], et al) [Y] 7,8* paragraphs [0038] - [0040]; figure 4 * | International search | [Y]JP2007227643 (FUJIFILM CORP) [Y] 12 * , [0015] - [0 0 2 4], *; | [Y]JP2008060198 (SONY CORP) [Y] 10, 11, 13 * , [0013] - [0014], *; | [Y]JP2008091771 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 12 * , [0051] - [0054], *; | [XY]JP2013065688 (SONY CORP) [X] 1-3, 7-9, 14, 15 * , [0044] - [0053], [0093] - [0095], 6, 23 & US 2013/0070131 A1, [0067]-[0076] & CN 103000644 A * [Y] 3-6, 10-13; | [A]JP2014096490 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-15 * , & US 2014/0131779 A1 & CN 103811507 A *; | [A]US2014327051 (AHN JUNG-CHAK [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* , the whole document & KR 10-2014-0130969 A *; | [A]JP2014229810 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-15 * , & US 2014/0346628 A1 & CN 104183611 A *; | [Y]JP2015023259 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 3, 4 * , [0009] - [0044], *; | [Y]US2016056199 (KIM YOUNG CHAN [KR], et al) [Y] 6 * , [0052]-[0063], Figs. 2-6 & KR 10-2016-0023218 A & CN 105390513 A *; | [Y]WO2016152512 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 5 * , [0099] - [0 1 1 2], 15 & JP 2016-181532 A & CN 107408566 A * | Examination | US2013070131 | US2016225815 | by applicant | JP2008103647 |