EP3606216 - COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2020/06] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UCHIYAMA, Hiromasa c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
KUSASHIMA, Naoki c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
SHIMEZAWA, Kazuyuki c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18770368.1 | 06.02.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018JP04054 | Priority number, date | JP20170058685 | 24.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017058685 | [2020/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018173523 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3606216 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04W72/02 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
H04W72/23 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/53 (KR,US);
H04W76/14 (US);
H04L5/0055 (US);
H04W72/02 (EP,KR);
H04W72/51 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2020/06] | H04W72/04, H04W72/02, H04W88/04, H04W92/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | [2020/06] | English: | COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND TERMINAL DEVICE | [2020/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2019 | Translation filed | 23.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 28.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/38] | 12.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - NEC, "Load balancing via dynamic resource sharing for multiple carriers and pools", vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20161114 - 20161118, (20161104), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1611722, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_87/Docs/, (20161104), XP051189154 [X] 1-3,8,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 4-7,9-13 | [XI] - NEC, "Resource pool design for collision detection and handling", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160513), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-164476, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_85/Docs/, (20160513), XP051090280 [X] 1,8,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 7,11-13 | [XI] - INTEL CORPORATION, "Details of resource pool design for sidelink V2V communication", vol. RAN WG1, no. Gothenburg, Sweden; 20160822 - 20160826, (20160821), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-166515 INTEL - V2V POOL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20160821), XP051125411 [X] 1,5,8,15 * the whole document * [I] 2-4,9,13,14 | International search | [Y]WO2015170727 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) [Y] 17* , [00 6 7] -[0068] & US 2016/0174279 A1, [0078] - [0079] & EP 3142459 A1 *; | [Y]WO2017026542 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [Y] 6, 9-15 * , [0 0 2 *; | [XY] - "Details of resource pool design for sidelink V2V communication", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1#86 R1-166515, (20160822), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_539/Docs/R1-166515.zip, XP051125411 [X] 1, 5, 16 * , Figure 1 * [Y] 2-4, 6-15, 17 | [XY] - LENOVO, "Resource pool for V2V", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1#85 R1-164646, (20160523), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_762/Docs/R1-164646.zip, XP051096874 [X] 1, 16 * , Figure 1 * [Y] 2-4, 6-15, 17 | [XY] - HUAWEI, "Resource pool design", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1#84 R1-160283, (20160215), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_84/Docs/R1-160283.zip, XP051053623 [X] 1, 16 * , Figure 1 - Figure 6 * [Y] 2-4, 6-15, 17 | [XY] - SAMSUNG, "Details on resource pool design", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1#86 R1-166717, (20160822), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_735/Docs/R1-166717.zip, XP051140341 [X] 1, 16 * , Figure 1- Figure 4 * [Y] 2-4, 6-15, 17 | [Y] - ZTE, "Resource pool allocation enhancement for V2V", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1#83 R1-156658, (20151115), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_83/Docs/R1-156658.zip, XP051003057 [Y] 2-4 * , Figure 4 * | [Y] - InterDigital, "D2D Communications", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 #74 R1-133178, (20130819), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_74/Docs/R1-133178.zip, XP050716387 [Y] 7-8, 12-13 * , Figure 4 * | by applicant | JP2016511798 |