EP3602403 - TRACK FEATURE DETECTION USING MACHINE VISION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harsco Technologies LLC 415 North Main Street Fairmont, MN 56031 / US | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERNANDEZ, Javier 415 North Main Street Farimont, MN 56031 / US | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18770817.7 | 22.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018US23838 | Priority number, date | US201762475722P | 23.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762475722 P | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018175772 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3602403 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/62, G06K9/46, G06K9/00 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
B61L23/042 (EP,US);
B61L23/045 (EP,US);
G06V10/56 (EP,US);
G06V20/56 (EP,US);
H04N7/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/06] | G06K9/62, G06K9/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | ERKENNUNG VON SPURMERKMALEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON MASCHINENVISION | [2020/06] | English: | TRACK FEATURE DETECTION USING MACHINE VISION | [2020/06] | French: | DÉTECTION DE CARACTÉRISTIQUES DE VOIE À L'AIDE DE LA VISION ARTIFICIELLE | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 31.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.09.2020 | 31.03.2021 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]GB2473534 (HARSCO CORP [US]); | International search | [A]US2012192756 (MILLER ROBERT S [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * See paragraphs [0034]-[0035] and figure 4. *; | [Y]US2013176435 (HAAS NORMAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * See paragraphs [0018]-[0023] claim 3 and figures 1-2 *; | [A]US2015131108 (KAINER JOHN J [US], et al) [A] 1-13* See claims 9,11 and figures 14-15. *; | [A]US9049433 (PRINCE JOHN H [US]) [A] 1-13 * See claims 1-4 and figures 2-3. *; | [Y]US2017066459 (SINGH SAMEER [GB]) [Y] 1-13 * See paragraphs [0174],[0192] and claim 41. * |