EP3602490 - SPECTRAL IMAGING APPARATUS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axon DX, LLC 379 Reas Ford Road Suite 1 Earlysville Business Park Earlysville, VA 22936 / US | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COUCH, Philip, R. Cotleigh Court Cotleigh Honiton EX14 9HG / GB | 02 /
MURPHY, Kent, A. 1800 Wilson Boulevard Unit 449 Arlington, VA 22201 / US | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/06] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 18770941.5 | 20.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018US23253 | Priority number, date | US201762475921P | 24.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762475921 P | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018175377 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3602490 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/174, G01N21/64, G01N21/17, G01N21/33, G01N21/01, G01J3/28, G01J3/44 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
G01N21/6458 (EP,US);
G01N21/6428 (US);
G01J3/027 (EP,US);
G01J3/2803 (EP,US);
G01J3/2823 (EP,US);
G01J3/4406 (EP,US);
G01N21/01 (EP,US);
G01N21/17 (EP,US);
G01N21/33 (EP,US);
G01N21/64 (EP,US);
G01N21/6489 (EP,US);
G01N33/4833 (US);
G02B21/0036 (US);
G02B21/0064 (US);
G02B21/0076 (US);
G02B21/008 (US);
G02B21/16 (EP,US);
G02B21/26 (US);
G02B21/36 (EP,US);
G01J2003/1234 (EP,US);
G01J2003/2806 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/06] | G06T7/174, G01N21/64, G01N21/17, G01N21/33, G01N21/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | SPEKTRALBILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | [2020/06] | English: | SPECTRAL IMAGING APPARATUS AND METHODS | [2020/06] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉS D'IMAGERIE SPECTRALE | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 10.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 01.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/11] | 23.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2016111308 (HIRAMOTO MASAO [JP]) [I] 1-15 * figures 1, 11-13 *; | [A]DE102004029733 (LEICA MICROSYSTEMS [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * | International search | [YA]WO2016111308 (HIRAMOTO MASAO [JP]) [Y] 1-8, 10, 13-15, 18-26, 29-31, 34-36 * ; abstract, page 5, paragraph 5, page 6, paragraphs 7-9, page 7, paragraphs 9-10, page 8, paragraphs 6-9, page 9, paragraph 12 to page 12, paragraph 1, figures 1, 3, 9a-b, 12-13b * [A] 9, 11-12, 16-17, 27-28, & 32-33; | [YA]US2016314583 (COUCH PHILIP [US], et al) [Y] 1-8, 10, 13-15, 18-26, 29-31, 34-36 * ; abstract, figures 7, 11, paragraphs [0025], [0054], [0109], [0115], [0159], [0169], [0172], claims 92, 94, 100 * [A] 11-12, 16-17, 27-28, & 32-33; | [Y]US2016131583 (BAMFORD PASCAL [US], et al) [Y] 3 & 20 * ; figure 3, paragraphs [0040]-[0041 ] *; | [A]US6495818 (MAO CHENGYE [US]) [A] 1-36 * ; figure 10, column 9, line 50 to column 10, line 61 * |