EP3601053 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DECELERATING AND REDIRECTING AN AIRBORNE PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parazero Ltd. 30 Dov Hoz Street 5555626 Kiryat Ono / IL | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSALIAH, Amir 15/23 Mandel Zinger Street 3498415 Haifa / IL | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18771183.3 | 15.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018IL50303 | Priority number, date | IL20170251342 | 22.03.2017 Original published format: IL 25134217 | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018173040 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3601053 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 27.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B64D19/02, G05D1/10, B64C19/00, B64C39/02 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
B64C19/00 (EP);
B64D19/02 (IL,US);
B64C39/024 (US);
B64U10/50 (EP);
B64U30/12 (EP,IL);
B64U70/80 (EP,IL);
B64U70/83 (EP,US);
G05D1/106 (US);
B64U10/13 (EP,IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/06] | B64D19/02, G05D1/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERZÖGERUNG UND UMLENKUNG EINER FLUGZEUGPLATTFORM | [2020/06] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DECELERATING AND REDIRECTING AN AIRBORNE PLATFORM | [2020/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE DÉCÉLÉRATION ET DE REDIRECTION D'UNE PLATEFORME AÉROPORTÉE | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 17.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US8733706 (FERNANDEZ IAN M [US], et al) [A] 10* abstract; figure - *; | [A]CN203889066U (LIU XIAOLIN, et al) [A] 1-10 * figure - *; | [A]CN104527976 (UNIV CIVIL AVIAT CHINA) [A] 1-10 * figure - *; | [Y]KR101609103B (KOREA AEROSPACE RES INST [KR]) [Y] 1,3 * paragraph [0042]; figure - *; | [XA]CN105691606 (UNIV BEIFANG NATIONALITIES) [X] 5 * the whole document * [A] 1-4,6-10; | [YA]WO2016193690 (IMP INNOVATIONS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,3 * paragraphs [0012] , [0164]; figure - * [A] 2,4-10 | International search | [XA]CN105691606 (UNIV BEIFANG NATIONALITIES) [X] 5 * Entire document Entire document *[A] 1-4, 6-10 | by applicant | KR101609103B | CN105691606 | WO2016193690 |