EP3605168 - LIQUID CRYSTAL CURED FILM AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeon Corporation 6-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJIWARA, Natsumi c/o ZEON CORPORATION 6-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | 02 /
NAKAJIMA, Shunpei c/o ZEON CORPORATION 6-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | 03 /
IKEDA, Akira c/o ZEON CORPORATION 6-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Norbert Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/06] | Hansen, Norbert Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18771901.8 | 08.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018JP09006 | Priority number, date | JP20170060159 | 24.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017060159 | [2020/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018173773 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3605168 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
C09K19/3086 (EP);
G02B1/10 (KR);
G02F1/133634 (US);
C09K19/0216 (US);
C09K19/3497 (EP);
G02B5/3083 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLGEHÄRTETER FILM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2020/06] | English: | LIQUID CRYSTAL CURED FILM AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2020/06] | French: | FILM DURCI À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SA FABRICATION | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2019 | Translation filed | 11.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 11.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 06.07.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2007102205 (FUJIFILM CORP) [X] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0037], [0158]-[0160], [0196]-[0201], table 2 & US 2008/0113112 A1, paragraphs [0064][0065], [0177]-[0181], [0228]-[0234], table 2 & WO 2007/029771 A1 & CN 101258433 A & TW 200717044 A *; | [Y]JP2005196117 (LG PHILIPS LCD CO LTD) [Y] 5-7 * , paragraphs [0028]-[0033], [0038][0045], fig. 4-5 & US 2005/0140880 A1, paragraphs [0059]-[0064], [0069]-[0078], fig. 4-5 & DE 102004031440 A1 & KR 10-2005-0070616 A & CN 1637502 A *; | [Y]JP2009062508 (FUJIFILM CORP) [Y] 5-7 * , paragraphs [0002], [0088]-[0096] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2000249835 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0016], [0027], [0031], [0057], [0115]-[0119], fig. 3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2007264259 (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 1-7 * , entire text & US 2007/0231506 A1 * | by applicant | JP5363022B | JP2015161714 | JP2016110153 | JP2005336103 | WO2009042544 | - "Yuki Gosei Jikkenhou Handbook (Organic synthesis experimental method handbook", The Society of Synthetic Organic Chemistry, Maruzen Co., Ltd., (19900000), page 810 | - Shin Jikken Kagaku Koza (New course of experimental chemistry, Maruzen Co., Ltd., (19780000), vol. 14 | - Jikken Kagaku Koza (Course of experimental chemistry, Maruzen Co., Ltd., (19920000), vol. 20 | - The Journal of Organic Chemistry, (20110000), vol. 76, pages 8082 - 8087 |