EP3600627 - BONE MARROW MICROFLUIDIC DEVICES AND METHODS FOR PREPARING AND USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states President and Fellows of Harvard College 17 Quincy Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | For all designated states The General Hospital Corporation 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOU, David, Benson 150 Staniford Street Unit 429 Boston, Massachusetts 02114 / US | 02 /
LEIJTEN, Liliana, S. Teixeira Moreira Haspengouw 55R Maastricht 6227 RM Limburg / NL | 03 /
RECH, Arianna 525 New Ashby Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 4EX / GB | 04 /
NOVAK, Richard 42 Rockview Street Apt. 4 Jamaica Plain, Massachusetts 02130 / US | 05 /
INGBER, Donald, E. 162 W. Canton Street Boston, Massachusetts 02118 / US | 06 /
MILTON, Yuka 223 Charles Street Apt. 1 Cambridge, Massachusetts 02141 / US | 07 /
FRISMANTAS, Viktoras 20 Fisher Avenue Apt. 1 Roxburg Crossing, Massachusetts 02120 / US | 08 /
LEVY, Oren 1386 Beacon Street Apt. 15 Brookline, Massachusetts 02446 / US | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/06] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18771902.6 | 26.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018US24377 | Priority number, date | US201762476205P | 24.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762476205 P | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018176043 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3600627 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01D59/36, B01J19/00, C12M1/00, C12N5/00, C12Q1/02, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/70 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
C12M23/16 (EP,GB,US);
G01N33/5011 (GB);
B01L3/502715 (US);
C12M23/34 (EP);
C12M25/02 (US);
C12M25/14 (EP);
C12M29/04 (EP);
C12M29/10 (EP,US);
C12M35/08 (EP);
C12N5/0068 (EP);
C12N5/0634 (GB);
C12N5/0669 (EP,GB,US);
G01N33/5008 (US);
G01N33/5047 (GB);
B01L2300/12 (US);
C12N2501/40 (US);
C12N2501/999 (US);
C12N2502/28 (US);
C12N2503/04 (GB);
C12N2513/00 (GB);
C12N2521/00 (EP,GB);
C12N2533/50 (EP,GB);
C12N2533/54 (US);
C12N2533/56 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | MIKROFLUIDISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN FÜR KNOCHENMARK UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2020/06] | English: | BONE MARROW MICROFLUIDIC DEVICES AND METHODS FOR PREPARING AND USING THE SAME | [2020/06] | French: | DISPOSITIFS MICROFLUIDIQUES DE MOELLE OSSEUSE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 02.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2012166903 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [Y] 1-8,18-20 * claims 1,11 *; | [A]WO2013086502 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [A] 1-8,18-20 * paragraph [00182]; claims 1i,6 *; | [Y]WO2016010861 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [Y] 1-8,18-20* claim 1 * | International search | [A]US2003087290 (TARLOV MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1, 30, 54, 78, 86* , para [0005]-[0049] *; | [Y]US2011250585 (INGBER DONALD E [US], et al) [Y] 1, 30, 54, 78, 86 * . Fig. 3A; para [0038]-[0040], [0047], [0060], [0080], [0111]-[0114], [0119]-[0121], [0197] *; | [A]US2011287978 (LEE DONG WOO [KR], et al) [A] 1, 30, 54, 78, 86 * , para [0011]-[0065] *; | [Y]US2016097033 (LOPEZ JOSE A [US], et al) [Y] 1, 30, 54, 78, 86 * , para [0004], [0007], [0017], [0028], [0029] * |