EP3681683 - DEVICE FOR INSERTING A TRANSPONDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peri GmbH Rudolf-Diesel-Strasse 19 89264 Weissenhorn / DE | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPAN, Wolfgang Bachstraße 3a 89287 Bellenberg / DE | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte PartG mbB Fuggerstraße 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 18773115.3 | 12.09.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018EP74564 | Priority number, date | DE201710121290 | 14.09.2017 Original published format: DE102017121290 | [2020/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019053044 | Date: | 21.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3681683 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B28B7/00, E04G17/00, G06K19/07, G06K19/077, H01Q13/10, G09F3/16, G09F3/18, E04G5/00 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
E04G17/00 (EP);
G09F3/18 (EP,US);
B28B7/0005 (EP);
E04G5/00 (EP);
G06K19/07758 (EP);
H01Q1/1207 (EP,US);
H01Q13/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINSETZEN EINES TRANSPONDERS | [2020/30] | English: | DEVICE FOR INSERTING A TRANSPONDER | [2020/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INSERTION D'UN TRANSPONDEUR | [2020/30] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 05.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]JP2000317931 (KOBAYASHI RECORDING PAPERS MFG) [X] 1,4,10,13 * figure 1 * [I] 2,3,5-9,11,12; | [A]DE10055060 (FISCHER ARTUR WERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * figure 6 *; | [A]DE202015002456U (PENSOLD ANDREAS [AT], et al) [A] 1-13* figures 1, 2 * | by applicant | DE10357695 | US2006232412 | DE102006029249 | DE202008001549U | WO2008098755 | DE202010005092U | DE102010038474 | WO2014048954 |