EP3691913 - WRITING, DRAWING, MARKING AND/OR COSMETIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STAEDTLER SE Moosäckerstraße 3 90427 Nürnberg / DE | [2024/04] |
Former [2020/33] | For all designated states STAEDTLER Mars GmbH & Co. KG Moosäckerstrasse 3 90427 Nürnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEISS, Peter Tizianstraße 72 90453 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
SCHULZE, Michael Neunhofer Haupstr. 26 90427 Nürnberg / DE | [2020/33] | Application number, filing date | 18773368.8 | 12.09.2018 | [2020/33] | WO2018EP74567 | Priority number, date | DE20171009364 | 04.10.2017 Original published format: DE102017009364 | [2020/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019068440 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3691913 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B43K8/00, B43K5/00, B43K7/00, B43K19/14, B43K21/00 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
B43K5/005 (EP,US);
B43K19/14 (EP,US);
A45D40/20 (US);
B43K21/006 (EP,US);
B43K7/005 (EP,US);
B43K8/003 (EP,US);
C04B14/06 (US);
C04B14/22 (US);
C04B18/24 (US);
C04B24/383 (US);
C04B28/021 (US);
C04B28/04 (US);
C04B2103/32 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Title | German: | SCHREIB-, ZEICHEN-, MARKIER- UND/ODER KOSMETIKGERÄT | [2020/33] | English: | WRITING, DRAWING, MARKING AND/OR COSMETIC DEVICE | [2020/33] | French: | APPAREIL À ÉCRIRE, À DESSINER, À MARQUER ET/OU APPAREIL COSMÉTIQUE | [2020/33] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 23.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9521063 (KHASHOGGI E IND [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]DE202007015369U (KARUTZ HOLGER [DE]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034]; figure 7 *; | [A]DE202012000422U (H & M GUTBERLET GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [A]WO2015079347 (PREMEC SA [CH]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE3049467 | DE202007015369U |