EP3685143 - METHOD FOR DEFORMING DEFORMABLE BODIES, AND DEVICES FOR THIS PURPOSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universität Greifswald Domstraße 11 17489 Greifswald / DE | [2020/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTTO, Oliver Holzteichstr. 36-37 17489 Greifswald / DE | 02 /
CZERWINSKI, Fabian Herbartstrasse 16B 14057 Berlin / DE | 03 /
FREGIN, Bob Strandstrasse 3d 17493 Greifswald / DE | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/31] | Application number, filing date | 18773759.8 | 21.09.2018 | [2020/31] | WO2018EP75605 | Priority number, date | DE20171008946 | 23.09.2017 Original published format: DE102017008946 | [2020/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019057894 | Date: | 28.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3685143 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3685143 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/14, G01N21/05 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
G01N15/1433 (EP,US);
G01N15/1404 (EP,US);
B01L3/502776 (US);
G01N15/147 (EP);
G01N33/5094 (US);
B01L2200/0636 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERFORMEN VON DEFORMIERBAREN KÖRPERN UND VORRICHTUNGEN DAZU | [2020/31] | English: | METHOD FOR DEFORMING DEFORMABLE BODIES, AND DEVICES FOR THIS PURPOSE | [2020/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN FORME DE CORPS DÉFORMABLES ET DISPOSITIFS ASSOCIÉS | [2020/31] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 16.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/24] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2016202172 (GUCK JOCHEN [DE], et al) [Y] 8,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0039] - [0042] - [0070] , [ 0083] *; | [XYI]US2017003273 (FARRELL GREGORY A [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7,10,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0026] , [0027] , [0030] , [0035] , [0147] , [0148] * [Y] 8,9 [I] 2,5,6; | [A] - ANDREJ POHAR ET AL, "Parallel flow of immiscible liquids in a microreactor: modeling and experimental study", MICROFLUIDICS AND NANOFLUIDICS, DE, (20120827), vol. 12, no. 1-4, doi:10.1007/s10404-011-0873-7, ISSN 1613-4982, pages 307 - 316, XP055528506 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10404-011-0873-7 | Examination | WO2015024690 | - Ma Shaohua ET AL, "Deformation of double emulsions under conditions of flow cytometry hydrodynamic focusing", Lab on a Chip, UK, vol. 15, no. 22, doi:10.1039/C5LC00693G, ISSN 1473-0197, (20150101), pages 4291 - 4301, URL: https://pubs.rsc.org/en/content/articlepdf/2015/lc/c5lc00693g, XP055781167 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C5LC00693G | by applicant | DE1815352 | WO2015024690 | - 0. OTTO et al., "Real-Time Deformability Cytometry: On the Fly Mechanical Phenotyping", Nature Methodes, (20150000), vol. 12, pages 199 - 202 | - A. MIETKE et al., "Extracting Cell Stiffness from Real-Time Deformability Cytometry: Theory and Experiment", Biophysical Journal, (20150000), vol. 109, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bpj.2015.09.006, pages 2023 - 2036, XP029300858 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bpj.2015.09.006 | - LI et al., J. Fluids Eng., (20110000), page 111202 | - A. ADAN, "Flow cytometry: basic principles and applications", Crit. Rev. Biotechnol., (20170000), vol. 37, pages 163 - 176 | - J. LI; P. S. SHEERAN; C. KLEINSTREUER, "Analysis of Multi-Layer Immiscible Fluid Flow in a Microchannel", J. Fluids Eng., (20110000), vol. 133, page 111202 | - HEROLD, ArXiv, (20170000), URL: https://arxiv.org/ftp/arxiv/papers/1704/1704.00572.pdf |