EP3604039 - VEHICULAR EXTERIOR COMPONENT AND ATTACHMENT STRUCTURE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Faltec Co., Ltd. 580 Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 212-0013 / JP | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ONUKI Soji c/o FALTEC Co. Ltd. 580 Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-0013 / JP | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/06] | Ashton, Timothy Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18774683.9 | 08.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018JP08959 | Priority number, date | JP20170067835 | 30.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017067835 | [2020/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018180336 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3604039 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60R9/052 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
B60R9/058 (EP);
B62D27/02 (US);
B60R9/04 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGAUSSENKOMPONENTE UND BEFESTIGUNGSSTRUKTUR DAFÜR | [2020/06] | English: | VEHICULAR EXTERIOR COMPONENT AND ATTACHMENT STRUCTURE THEREFOR | [2020/06] | French: | COMPOSANT EXTÉRIEUR DE VÉHICULE ET STRUCTURE DE FIXATION ASSOCIÉE | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2019 | Translation filed | 27.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 19.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2011192870 (MICHIE GORDON [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7 * figures 21-26; claim 1 * [A] 3,4; | [XAI]US2014117723 (SLACK ROBERT T [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7 * paragraphs [0060] , [0072]; figures 1-4 * [A] 3-5[I] 2 | International search | [XA]JPH0627352U [X] 1, 5, 7 * 4 - 0 0 1 3, & US 5377889 A, * [A] 2-4, 6; | [A]JPH11278164 (MAZDA MOTOR) [A] 1-7* , *; | [A]US6250528 (LUMPE KARL-HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * , * | by applicant | JP2001328492 | JP2017067835 |