EP3609332 - METHODS AND AGRICULTURAL COMPOSITIONS FOR PREVENTING OR CONTROLLING PLANT DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tenfold Technologies, LLC 801 S Hwy 377 Pilot Point, TX 76258 / US | [2020/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUAN, Shaohua 13433 Morley Drive Frisco, Texas 75035 / US | 02 /
RAJBANSHI, Shashi Shankar 7549 Stonebrook Parkway Apt. 909 Frisco, Texas 75034 / US | 03 /
HILL, Curtis Brian 309 Turnstone Drive Little Elm, Texas 75068 / US | [2020/08] | Representative(s) | Murray, Adrian D'Coligny Brand Murray Fuller LLP 50 Eastcastle Street London W1W 8EA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/08] | HGF Limited 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 18775154.0 | 27.03.2018 | [2020/08] | WO2018US24638 | Priority number, date | US201762477297P | 27.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762477297 P | US201762597796P | 12.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762597796 P | [2020/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018183381 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3609332 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/15, A61P31/04, A61P31/10, C12N1/20, C12N1/21, C12P21/02, A01N63/22, A01N63/25, C05F11/08, C12R1/12, C05G3/60, A01P3/00, C12R1/07 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
C05F11/08 (EP);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
A01H5/10 (US);
A01N63/22 (EP,US);
A01N63/25 (EP,US);
C12R2001/07 (EP,US);
C12R2001/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C05F11/08, C05G3/60 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/08] | A01N63/02, C05F11/08, C12R1/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR PRÄVENTION ODER BEKÄMPFUNG VON PFLANZENKRANKHEITEN | [2020/08] | English: | METHODS AND AGRICULTURAL COMPOSITIONS FOR PREVENTING OR CONTROLLING PLANT DISEASES | [2020/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS AGRICOLES PERMETTANT DE PRÉVENIR OU DE LUTTER CONTRE LES MALADIES DES PLANTES | [2020/08] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 29.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Divisional application(s) | EP23202103.0 / EP4293129 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6602500 (KHARBANDA PREM DUTT [CA], et al); | [XI]US2007248583 (KOCHI SHINICHIRO [JP], et al); | [XI]WO2016020371 (BASF SE [DE]); | [XI]US2016278388 (BEAU JEREMY [US], et al) | International search | [XY]US6602500 (KHARBANDA PREM DUTT [CA], et al); | [A]US7935335 (KOCHI SHINICHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]WO2016020371 (BASF SE [DE]); | [Y]CN105646015 (UNIV CHINA AGRICULTURAL); | by applicant | US6602500 | WO2004049778 | US2007248583 | WO2016020371 | US2016278388 |