EP3605148 - SOLID-STATE IMAGING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHII, Motonori c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
KOYAMA, Shinzo c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
TAKEMOTO, Masato c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
SAITOU, Shigeru c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18775203.5 | 19.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018JP10690 | Priority number, date | JP20170064142 | 29.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017064142 | [2020/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018180660 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3605148 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/10, G01S17/89, G01C3/06, H04N5/3745, G01S7/4863, G01S7/487, H01L27/146, G01S17/894 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
G01S17/894 (EP,US);
G01C3/06 (EP);
G01S17/10 (EP);
G01S7/4863 (EP);
G01S7/4873 (EP);
H01L27/14612 (US);
H01L27/14641 (EP);
H01L27/14643 (EP);
H04N25/75 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/15] | G01S17/10, G01S17/89, G01C3/06, H04N5/3745, G01S7/4863, G01S7/487, H01L27/146 | ||
Former IPC [2020/06] | G01S17/10, G01S17/89, G01C3/06, H04N5/3745 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | FESTKÖRPERBILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/06] | English: | SOLID-STATE IMAGING DEVICE | [2020/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2019 | Translation filed | 23.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 23.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/09] | 25.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2012056078 (ELDESOUKI MUNIR [CA], et al) [Y] 1,2,6 * paragraphs [0003] , [0048] , [0049] , [0055] - [0065]; figures 2-5 * [A] 3-5; | [A]US2016320486 (MURAI YOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0071] - [0100]; figures 1,8-15 *; | [A]WO2017004663 (COMMONWEALTH AUSTRALIA [AU]) [A] 1-6* figures 1-4 *; | [YA] - CRISTIANO NICLASS ET AL, "A 100-m Range 10-Frame/s 340 $\,\times\, $ 96-Pixel Time-of-Flight Depth Sensor in 0.18- $\mu\hbox{m}$ CMOS", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE, (20130201), vol. 48, no. 2, doi:10.1109/JSSC.2012.2227607, ISSN 0018-9200, pages 559 - 572, XP011489698 [Y] 1,2,6 * Sections I - IV;; figure 2 * [A] 3-5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSSC.2012.2227607 | International search | [A]JP2006242716 (CANON KK) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0021]-[0036], fig. 1, 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2010091378 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0028]-[0057], fig. 1-7 (Family: none) *; | [A]US2014124653 (DUTTON NEALE [GB], et al) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0007]-[0040], fig. 1-4 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2015065524 (NIKON CORP) [A] 1-6* , paragraphs [0008]-[0026], fig. 1-3 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2004294420 |