EP3601037 - SIDEWALL PANEL ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C&D Zodiac, Inc. 5701 Bolsa Avenue Huntington Beach, CA 92647 / US | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITHSON, Tyler 5701 Bolsa Avenue Huntington Beach, CA 92647 / US | 02 /
PAYNE, Jordan, Thomas 5701 Bolsa Avenue Huntington Beach, CA 92647 / US | 03 /
MERRELL, Tyson, Dean 5701 Bolsa Avenue Huntington Beach CA 92647 / US | 04 /
HILLS, Stephen, Michael 5701 Bolsa Avenue Huntington Beach CA 92647 / US | 05 /
BROOKS, Christopher 5701 Bolsa Avenue Huntington Beach CA 92647 / US | 06 /
BANGERTER, Matthew 5701 Bolsa Avenue Huntington Beach CA 92647 / US | 07 /
RIDGES, Michael, D. 5701 Bolsa Avenue Huntington Beach CA 92647 / US | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/06] | 01 /
SMITHSON, Tyler 5701 Bolsa Avenue Huntington Beach CA 92647 / US | ||
02 /
PAYNE, Jordan, Thomas 5701 Bolsa Avenue Huntington Beach CA 92647 / US | |||
03 /
MERRELL, Tyson, Dean 5701 Bolsa Avenue Huntington Beach CA 92647 / US | |||
04 /
HILLS, Stephen, Michael 5701 Bolsa Avenue Huntington Beach CA 92647 / US | |||
05 /
BROOKS, Christopher 5701 Bolsa Avenue Huntington Beach CA 92647 / US | |||
06 /
BANGERTER, Matthew 5701 Bolsa Avenue Huntington Beach CA 92647 / US | |||
07 /
RIDGES, Michael, D. 5701 Bolsa Avenue Huntington Beach CA 92647 / US | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/31] | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | ||
Former [2020/06] | Stevenson-Hill, Jack Patrick Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 18775550.9 | 29.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018US25256 | Priority number, date | US201762479128P | 30.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762479128 P | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018183750 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3601037 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3601037 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B64C1/06, B64C1/12 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
F16B5/0088 (EP,CN,US);
B64C1/066 (EP,CN,US);
B64C1/12 (CN,US);
F16B21/02 (EP,US);
F16B21/04 (CN);
F16B21/09 (EP,CN,US);
F16B5/07 (CN,US);
F16B5/123 (EP,CN,US);
F16B5/126 (CN,US);
F16B19/1081 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SEITENWANDTAFELANORDNUNG | [2020/06] | English: | SIDEWALL PANEL ASSEMBLY | [2020/06] | French: | ENSEMBLE PANNEAU DE PAROI LATÉRALE | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 27.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 02.08.2023 | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | IT | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | NL | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SI | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
IT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0262704 (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1-11 * figure - *; | [A]JPH11155761 (INAX CORP) [A] 1* figure - * | International search | [A]US4000870 (DAVIES DAVID J) [A] 1-15* , entire document. *; | [A]US2007252041 (EBNER JAMES E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * , entire document, especially Fig. 1, 2A; para [0023], [0027], [0028], [0030]. *; | [A]US2008067289 (MEYER CEDRIC [FR]) [A] 1-15 * , entire document. *; | [A]US2009277994 (LOBATO FABIANO [BR], et al) [A] 1-15 * , entire document. *; | [A]US2013320140 (CHEUNG W KWUN-WING [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * , entire document, especially Fig. 1A, 1B, 2, 3, 10-14; para [0038], [0041], [0044], [0047], [0048], [0064], [0066], [0068], [0069]. *; | [A]US2014117157 (DIEP PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * , entire document. * |