EP3433780 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR VIRTUAL SCREENING AND CLASSIFYING CHEMICAL COMPOUNDS FOR TARGET POLYMER BINDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/05] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CORRECTING ERROR IN A FIRST CLASSIFIER BY EVALUATING CLASSIFIER OUTPUT IN PARALLEL | ||
[2021/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atomwise Inc. 717 Market Street, Suite 800 San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | [2019/52] |
Former [2019/05] | For all designated states Atomwise Inc. 221 Main Street, No.1350 San Francisco, CA 94105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIFETS, Abraham, Samuel 717 Market Street Suite 800 San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | 02 /
WALLACH, Izhar 717 Market Street Suite 800 San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | 03 /
NGUYEN, Kong 717 Market Street Suite 800 San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | [2019/50] |
Former [2019/05] | 01 /
HEIFETS, Abraham, Samuel 1087 Mission Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | ||
02 /
WALLACH, Izhar 1087 Mission Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | |||
03 /
NGUYEN, Kong 1087 Mission Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/05] | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18776308.1 | 27.03.2018 | [2019/05] | WO2018US24474 | Priority number, date | US201715473980 | 30.03.2017 Original published format: US201715473980 | [2019/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018183263 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3433780 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3433780 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 22.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G16C20/70, G16C20/64, // G16B15/30, G16B35/20, G16B40/00, G16C20/50 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
G06N3/08 (EP,US);
G06F18/214 (US);
G06F18/2413 (EP,US);
G06F18/27 (EP,US);
G06N3/04 (US);
G06N3/045 (EP,US);
G06N5/04 (US);
G06V10/774 (EP,US);
G16B40/00 (EP,US);
G16C20/30 (US);
G16C20/64 (EP,US);
G16C20/70 (EP,US);
G06F18/20 (EP,US);
G06N20/10 (EP,US);
G06N3/126 (EP,US);
G06N5/01 (EP,US);
G06N7/01 (EP,US);
G16B15/30 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/09] | G16C20/50, G16C20/64, G16C20/70, // G16B15/30, G16B35/20, G16B40/00 | ||
Former IPC [2019/05] | G06F19/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND METHODEN ZUM VIRTUELLEN SCREENING UND KLASSIFIZIEREN VON CHEMISCHEN VERBINDUNGEN ZUR ZIELPOLYMERBINDUNG | [2021/13] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR VIRTUAL SCREENING AND CLASSIFYING CHEMICAL COMPOUNDS FOR TARGET POLYMER BINDING | [2021/13] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE DÉPISTAGE VIRTUEL ET DE CLASSIFICATION DE COMPOSÉS CHIMIQUES POUR LA LIAISON DE POLYMÈRE CIBLE | [2021/13] |
Former [2019/05] | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR FEHLERKORREKTUR IN EINEM ERSTEN KLASSIERER DURCH AUSWERTUNG DER KLASSIERERAUSGABE IM PARALLELDESIGN | ||
Former [2019/05] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CORRECTING ERROR IN A FIRST CLASSIFIER BY EVALUATING CLASSIFIER OUTPUT IN PARALLEL | ||
Former [2019/05] | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE CORRECTION D'ERREUR DANS UN PREMIER CLASSIFICATEUR PAR ÉVALUATION D'UNE SORTIE DU CLASSIFICATEUR EN PARALLÈLE | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/05] | 11.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.03.2018 | AL | 16.06.2021 | AT | 16.06.2021 | CY | 16.06.2021 | CZ | 16.06.2021 | DK | 16.06.2021 | EE | 16.06.2021 | ES | 16.06.2021 | FI | 16.06.2021 | HR | 16.06.2021 | IT | 16.06.2021 | LT | 16.06.2021 | LV | 16.06.2021 | MC | 16.06.2021 | MK | 16.06.2021 | NL | 16.06.2021 | PL | 16.06.2021 | RO | 16.06.2021 | RS | 16.06.2021 | SE | 16.06.2021 | SI | 16.06.2021 | SK | 16.06.2021 | SM | 16.06.2021 | BG | 16.09.2021 | NO | 16.09.2021 | GR | 17.09.2021 | IS | 16.10.2021 | PT | 18.10.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 27.03.2018 | |
AL | 16.06.2021 | ||
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CY | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 27.03.2018 | |
AL | 16.06.2021 | ||
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN102930181B (UNIV SICHUAN) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [X]US2016300127 (HEIFETS ABRAHAM SAMUEL [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A] - SEIFERT M. H. J. ET AL, "Targeted scoring functions for virtual screening", DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 14, no. 11-12, doi:10.1016/J.DRUDIS.2009.03.013, ISSN 1359-6446, (20090601), pages 562 - 569, (20090405), XP026158113 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.drudis.2009.03.013 | [A] - LOBANOV V., "Using artificial neural networks to drive virtual screening of combinatorial libraries", DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY: BIOSILICO, ELSEVIER, AVANEL, US, (20040701), vol. 2, no. 4, doi:10.1016/S1741-8364(04)02402-3, ISSN 1741-8364, pages 149 - 156, XP004545575 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1741-8364(04)02402-3 | [A] - KHAMIS M. A. ET AL, "Deep learning is competing random forest in computational docking", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20160824), XP080721916 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * | [A] - SENANAYAKE U. ET AL, "Machine learning based search space optimisation for drug discovery", 2013 IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON COMPUTATIONAL INTELLIGENCE IN BIOINFORMATICS AND COMPUTATIONAL BIOLOGY (CIBCB), IEEE, (20130416), doi:10.1109/CIBCB.2013.6595390, pages 68 - 75, XP032480235 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CIBCB.2013.6595390 | [A] - MUEGGE I. ET AL, "Advances in virtual screening", DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY: TECHNOLOGIES, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070130), vol. 3, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.DDTEC.2006.12.002, ISSN 1740-6749, pages 405 - 411, XP005873826 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ddtec.2006.12.002 | International search | [A]US2006034495 (MILLER MATTHEW L [US], et al)[A] 1-55; | [A]US2015238148 (GEORGESCU BOGDAN [US], et al) [A] 1-55; | [A]US2015278441 (MIN RENQIANG [US], et al) [A] 1-55; | [A]US2016300127 (HEIFETS ABRAHAM SAMUEL [US], et al) [A] 1-55 |