EP3608437 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING STEAM-TREATED PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2020/51] |
Former [2020/07] | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL NISSHIN CO., LTD. 4-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8366 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO Masaki c/o NIPPON STEEL NISSHIN CO., LTD. 4-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8366 / JP | 02 /
KURISU Yoshinobu c/o NIPPON STEEL NISSHIN CO., LTD. 4-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8366 / JP | 03 /
SATO Toshiaki c/o NIPPON STEEL NISSHIN CO., LTD. 4-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8366 / JP | 04 /
YASUDA Toyoharu c/o NIPPON STEEL NISSHIN CO., LTD. 4-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8366 / JP | 05 /
TAKAHASHI Ichiro c/o NIPPON STEEL NISSHIN CO., LTD. 4-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8366 / JP | 06 /
NAKAMIZO Hiroyuki c/o NIPPON STEEL NISSHIN CO., LTD. 4-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8366 / JP | 07 /
NAKANO Tadashi c/o NIPPON STEEL NISSHIN CO., LTD. 4-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8366 / JP | 08 /
TSUJI Hirokazu c/o NIPPON STEEL NISSHIN CO., LTD. 4-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8366 / JP | 09 /
HAYASHIDA Takahide c/o NIPPON STEEL NISSHIN CO., LTD. 4-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8366 / JP | 10 /
YUKURA Yoshitaka c/o NIPPON STEEL NISSHIN KOKI Co., Ltd. 2-3 Chuo 1-chome Kure-shi Hiroshima 737-0051 / JP | 11 /
OHTA Tsutomu c/o NIPPON STEEL NISSHIN KOKI Co., Ltd. 2-3 Chuo 1-chome Kure-shi Hiroshima 737-0051 / JP | 12 /
KAJIMOTO Shinichi c/o NIPPON STEEL NISSHIN KOKI Co., Ltd. 2-3 Chuo 1-chome Kure-shi Hiroshima 737-0051 / JP | 13 /
UCHIYAMA Takumi c/o NIPPON STEEL NISSHIN KOKI Co., Ltd. 2-3 Chuo 1-chome Kure-shi Hiroshima 737-0051 / JP | 14 /
SUZUKI Noboru c/o KROSAKIHARIMA CORPORATION 1-1 Higashihama-machi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 806-8586 / JP | 15 /
TSUCHIYAMA Masahiko c/o KROSAKIHARIMA CORPORATION 1-1 Higashihama-machi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 806-8586 / JP | 16 /
MURAI Yuusuke c/o KROSAKIHARIMA CORPORATION 1-1 Higashihama-machi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 806-8586 / JP | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2020/07] | Application number, filing date | 18776691.0 | 29.03.2018 | [2020/07] | WO2018JP13171 | Priority number, date | JP20170072636 | 31.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017072636 | JP20180058868 | 26.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018058868 | [2020/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018181685 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3608437 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C23C8/16, C22C18/00, C22C18/04, C22C21/10, F27B5/16 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
C23C8/16 (EP,KR,US);
C21D9/46 (US);
C21D1/767 (US);
C23C8/02 (EP);
C23C8/80 (EP,KR,US);
F27B5/16 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/07] | C23C8/16, C22C18/00, C22C18/04, C22C21/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DAMPFBEHANDELTEN PRODUKTS | [2020/07] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING STEAM-TREATED PRODUCT | [2020/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION DE PRODUIT TRAITÉ À LA VAPEUR | [2020/07] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2019 | Translation filed | 31.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 11.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS63277749 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-6* abstract *; | [X]JPH11241123 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5,6 * paragraphs [0002] , [00 3] , [00 6] , [0010] , [0 18] - [0019] - [0 21] , [0022]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP2843082 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [E]EP3425081 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-6 * paragraphs [0009] , [0 10] , [0 18] , [0 31] - [0036] - [0 37] - [0038] - [0 39] - [0040] - [0 47] , [0 49] , [0 52] , [0 61] , [0062]; figures 2-4 *; | [E]EP3572552 (NIPPON STEEL NISSHIN CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-6 * paragraphs [0015] , [0 18] , [0 59] , [0 63] , [0 77] - [0087]; figures 1-3 * | International search | [XA]JPH013492 [X] 1, 6 * , 5 5 19, 5 13 - 6 20 1 & US 5002009 A, paragraph4 line54-paragraph5 line9, paragraph6 line35-paragraph7 line30, FIG. 1 & US 4859251 A & EP 284233 A1 & DE 3872417 A & CN 88101245 A * [A] 2-5; | [Y]JPH08337867 (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO) [Y] 1, 4-6 * , [0016]-[0024], [0030], 1 *; | [A]JP2012132061 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD) [A] 1-6* , [0022]-[0027], 2 *; | [YA]JP6072952B [Y] 1, 4-6 * , [0017]-[0049], 2, 3 & WO 2017/149800 A1 & TW 201732058 A * [A] 2, 3 | by applicant | JP6072952B |