EP3604622 - PLATING LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2020/06] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Mami c/o CENTRAL RESEARCH INSTITUTE MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 1002-14 Mukohyama Naka-shi Ibaraki 311-0102 / JP | 02 /
NAKAYA, Kiyotaka c/o CENTRAL RESEARCH INSTITUTE MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 1002-14 Mukohyama Naka-shi Ibaraki 311-0102 / JP | 03 /
KONNO, Yasushi c/o CENTRAL RESEARCH INSTITUTE MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 1002-14 Mukohyama Naka-shi Ibaraki 311-0102 / JP | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/06] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 18777379.1 | 02.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018JP07997 | Priority number, date | JP20170061175 | 27.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017061175 | JP20180031865 | 26.02.2018 Original published format: JP 2018031865 | [2020/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018180192 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3604622 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C25D3/30, C25D3/32, C25D3/60, C25D7/00, C25D7/12 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
C25D3/32 (EP,KR,US);
C25D3/60 (EP);
C25D7/00 (EP);
C25D7/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/06] | C25D3/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | PLATTIERUNGSFLÜSSIGKEIT | [2020/06] | English: | PLATING LIQUID | [2020/06] | French: | LIQUIDE DE PLACAGE | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2019 | Translation filed | 17.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 02.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/39] | 24.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JP2005290505 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP, et al) [XD] 1,2 * abstract ** paragraph [0039] * | International search | [Y]JPS5864393 (KIZAI KK) [Y] 1-2 * , claims, page 2, lower left, 15 to upper right, line 6, examples 1, 2 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPS61117298 (NIPPON MINING CO) [Y] 1-2 * , claims, page 2, lower right, lines 11-15, examples (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS63161188 (NIPPON MINING CO) [A] 1-2* , claims (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH10306396 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO) [Y] 1-2 * , claims, paragraph [0005], examples (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2003342778 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO) [Y] 1-2 * , claims, paragraphs [0013], [0042]-[0046], example 1 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2007332447 (ADEKA CORP) [Y] 1-2 * , claims, paragraphs [0013]-[0017], examples 1, 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2011063834 (MITSUBISHI SHINDO KK) [A] 1-2 * , claims, paragraph [0024] (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPS61175 | JP2005290505 | JP2012087393 | JP2013044001 | JP2017061175 | JP2018031865 |