EP3604758 - TRACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yanmar Power Technology Co., Ltd. Chayamachi 1-32 Kita Ward Osaka City / JP | [2020/38] |
Former [2020/06] | For all designated states Yanmar Co., Ltd. 1-32, Chayamachi Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8311 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOMURA, Kazuo c/o YANMAR Co. Ltd. 1-32 Chayamachi Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8311 / JP | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Landaubogen 1-3 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/06] | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18777800.6 | 21.02.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018JP06136 | Priority number, date | JP20170069277 | 30.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017069277 | [2020/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018180028 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3604758 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F01N13/08, B60K13/04, F01N3/28, F01N13/20, F01N13/00, F01N13/18 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
F01N13/008 (EP,KR,US);
F01N13/08 (EP,KR,US);
B60K13/04 (EP,KR,US);
F01N13/082 (EP);
F01N13/085 (EP);
F01N13/18 (EP);
F01N13/20 (KR,US);
F01N3/28 (US);
F01N2260/20 (EP);
F01N2560/02 (KR,US);
F01N2560/026 (EP);
F01N2590/08 (EP);
Y02A50/20 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/06] | F01N13/08, B60K13/04, F01N3/28, F01N13/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | TRAKTOR | [2020/06] | English: | TRACTOR | [2020/06] | French: | TRACTEUR | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2019 | Translation filed | 23.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 23.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 11.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/10] | 02.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2010069806 (AGCO GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1 * pages 4,5; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2011192153 (SCHMIDT KEITH JONATHAN [US]) [A] 1,5,6 * the whole document *; | [X]US2014331658 (ADUPALA RAJESHWAR R [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6 * paragraphs [0021] , [0025] , [0027] - [0029]; figures 4-6 *; | [A]DE102013225767 (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1,5,6* the whole document *; | [A]WO2016140336 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5,6 * paragraphs [0056] - [0059]; figures 7,8 * | International search | [Y]JPS58102707U (MITSUBISHI AGRICULT MACH CO., LTD.) [Y] 2-6 * , specification, page 3, line 11 to page 5, line 9, fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]US2011192153 (SCHMIDT KEITH JONATHAN [US]) [A] 1* , paragraphs [0010]-[0014], fig. 1 & DE 102011003498 A1 *; | [XY]US2014331658 (ADUPALA RAJESHWAR R [US], et al) [X] 1 * , paragraphs [0021]-[0034], fig. 1-6 & CN 104995382 A & EP 2925979 A1 & WO 2014/084959 A1 * [Y] 2-6; | [Y]JP2016203753 (ISEKI AGRICULT MACH) [Y] 2-6 * , paragraphs [0027], [0029]-[0030], fig. 4, 9 & AU 2016202417 A1 & CN 106065803 A & EP 3085917 A1 & KR 10-2016-0124660 A & US 2016/0305305 A1, paragraphs [0032], [0034]-[0035], fig. 4, 9 * | by applicant | US2011283687 | JP2016203753 |