EP3604223 - COATED MAGNESIUM OXIDE PARTICLE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND THERMALLY CONDUCTIVE RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ube Material Industries, Ltd. 1985, Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8510 / JP | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIDA Naoto c/o Ube Material Industries Ltd. 1985 Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8510 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA Koji c/o Ube Material Industries Ltd. 1985 Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8510 / JP | 03 /
YAMAGUCHI Seiji c/o Ube Material Industries Ltd. 1985 Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8510 / JP | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18777926.9 | 27.02.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018JP07220 | Priority number, date | JP20170063552 | 28.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017063552 | [2020/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018180123 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3604223 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C01F5/02, C08K3/22, C08K9/04, C08L101/00, C09C1/02 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
C09C1/028 (EP);
C09C3/08 (US);
C01F5/02 (EP);
C08K3/013 (US);
C08K3/22 (EP);
C08K5/09 (US);
C08K5/5403 (US);
C08K9/04 (EP);
C08K9/06 (US);
C08L101/00 (EP,US);
C01P2004/32 (US);
C01P2004/51 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP);
C01P2006/10 (EP);
C01P2006/11 (EP);
C01P2006/12 (EP);
C01P2006/19 (EP,US);
C08K2003/2217 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/06] | C01F5/02, C08K3/22, C08K9/04, C08L101/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETER MAGNESIUMOXIDPARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND THERMISCH LEITFÄHIGE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2020/06] | English: | COATED MAGNESIUM OXIDE PARTICLE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND THERMALLY CONDUCTIVE RESIN COMPOSITION | [2020/06] | French: | PARTICULE D'OXYDE DE MAGNÉSIUM REVÊTUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION, ET COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE THERMOCONDUCTRICE | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2019 | Translation filed | 17.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 16.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3362970 (PATTON RICHARD A) [X] 1,7 * example 1 *[I] 8-10; | [XI]EP2980021 (KONOSHIMA CHEMICAL [JP]) [X] 1,2 * example 5; claims 1-5 * [I] 3-6 | International search | [A]JPS61270213 (SHIN NIHON KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [A] 1-10 * , *; | [A]JPH03501380 [A] 1-10 * , *; | [A]JP2011068757 (KONOSHIMA CHEMICAL) [A] 1-10* , ( *; | [A]JP2016106160 (KONOSHIMA CHEMICAL) [A] 1-10 * , * | by applicant | JPH06171928 | WO2005033214 | JP2016088838 |