EP3604453 - COATED PIGMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYO ALUMINIUM KABUSHIKI KAISHA 6-8, Kyutaromachi 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0056 / JP | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYASHI, Futa c/o TOYO ALUMINIUM KABUSHIKI KAISHA 6-8 Kyutaromachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0056 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Masami c/o TOYO ALUMINIUM KABUSHIKI KAISHA 6-8 Kyutaromachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0056 / JP | 03 /
KAWASHIMA, Katsura c/o TOYO ALUMINIUM KABUSHIKI KAISHA 6-8 Kyutaromachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0056 / JP | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18778125.7 | 22.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018JP11546 | Priority number, date | JP20170073272 | 31.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017073272 | [2020/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018180936 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3604453 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/62, B22F1/00, B22F1/02, C09C1/64, C09C3/08, C09C3/12, C09D17/00 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
C09C1/62 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/14 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/08 (US);
C08K3/10 (US);
C08K3/22 (US);
C08K9/02 (US);
C08K9/06 (KR,US);
C08K9/08 (US);
C08L57/00 (US);
C08L87/00 (US);
C09C1/64 (KR,US);
C09C1/642 (EP,US);
C09C1/648 (US);
C09C3/12 (KR,US);
C09D17/006 (KR,US);
C09D5/028 (US);
C09D5/28 (EP);
C09D5/29 (EP,US);
C09D7/62 (EP,US);
C09D7/63 (EP,US);
C22C1/0416 (EP,US);
C23C18/1216 (EP,US);
C23C18/122 (EP,US);
C01P2004/03 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2006/62 (EP);
C08K2003/0812 (EP,US);
C08K2003/2227 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETES PIGMENT | [2020/06] | English: | COATED PIGMENT | [2020/06] | French: | PIGMENT REVÊTU | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2019 | Translation filed | 31.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 14.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP21203163.7 / EP3978574 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JP2003147226 (TOYO ALUMINIUM KK) [XD] 1-6 * abstract * * claims 1-8 * * paragraphs [0010] - [0015] - [ 149] , [0153] *; | [XD]WO2004096921 (TOYO ALUMINIUM KK [JP], et al) [XD] 1-6 * abstract * * claims 1-5 * * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] , [0051] - [0053] - [0007] , [0010] - [0015] - [0019] - [0021] - [0060] , [0076] , [0115] , [0116] , [0184] , [0223] *; | [A]US2015125707 (MASUDA KOHEI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract ** paragraph [0130] *; | [X] - YINGCHAO ZHANG ET AL, "Preparation and characterisation of aluminium pigments coated with silica for corrosion protection", CORROSION SCIENCE, OXFORD, GB, vol. 53, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.CORSCI.2011.01.027, ISSN 0010-938X, (20110114), pages 1694 - 1699, (20110125), XP028156789 [X] 1,2,4-6 * abstract * * paragraph [Introduction] * * page 1698, column left, paragraph first full paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.corsci.2011.01.027 | International search | [X]JP2003147226 (TOYO ALUMINIUM KK) [X] 1-6 * , *; | [A]JP2004124069 (SHOWA DENKO KK, et al) [A] 1-6* , - *; | [X]WO2004096921 (TOYO ALUMINIUM KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * , *; | [X]WO2007043453 (TOYO ALUMINIUM KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-3, 5, 6 * , *; | [X]JP2009007616 (JGC CATALYSTS & CHEMICALS LTD) [X] 1, 3, 4 * , 1, 3, 5, 6, 8, [0007], [0024], [0028]-[0032], [0042 *; | [X]JP2015078321 (TAKA MATERIAL & SYSTEMS LAB INC) [X] 1, 2, 4-6 * , 1, [0009]-[0011], [0018]-[0021], [0028]-[0030] * | by applicant | JP2003147226 | WO2004096921 | JP4216903B |