EP3679622 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING A PLURALITY OF ELECTRODE STACKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/29] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING AN ELECTRODE STACK | ||
[2022/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OPTIMA life science GmbH Steinbeisweg 20 74523 Schwäbisch Hall / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/29] | For all designated states Optima Life Science GmbH Steinbeisweg 20 74523 Schwäbisch Hall / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEYERHERD, Jürgen Steinäckerweg 18 74545 Michelfeld / DE | 02 /
JANSEN, Johannes Wiesenstraße 65 74545 Michelfeld / DE | 03 /
WIELAND, Werner Waldbuch 25 74586 Frankenhardt / DE | [2020/29] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/29] | Application number, filing date | 18778376.6 | 07.09.2018 | [2020/29] | WO2018EP74088 | Priority number, date | DE201710215905 | 08.09.2017 Original published format: DE102017215905 | [2020/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019048589 | Date: | 14.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3679622 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3679622 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/04 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
H01M10/0404 (EP);
H01M10/0413 (EP);
H01M10/0468 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG MEHRERER ELEKTRODENSTAPEL | [2022/06] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING A PLURALITY OF ELECTRODE STACKS | [2022/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA FABRICATION DES EMPILEMENTS D'ÉLECTRODES | [2022/06] |
Former [2020/29] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ELEKTRODENSTAPELS | ||
Former [2020/29] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING AN ELECTRODE STACK | ||
Former [2020/29] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA FABRICATION D'UN EMPILEMENT D'ÉLECTRODES | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/29] | 03.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.09.2018 | AL | 29.06.2022 | CY | 29.06.2022 | CZ | 29.06.2022 | DK | 29.06.2022 | EE | 29.06.2022 | ES | 29.06.2022 | FI | 29.06.2022 | HR | 29.06.2022 | IT | 29.06.2022 | LT | 29.06.2022 | LV | 29.06.2022 | MC | 29.06.2022 | MK | 29.06.2022 | NL | 29.06.2022 | PL | 29.06.2022 | RO | 29.06.2022 | RS | 29.06.2022 | SE | 29.06.2022 | SI | 29.06.2022 | SK | 29.06.2022 | SM | 29.06.2022 | TR | 29.06.2022 | IE | 07.09.2022 | LU | 07.09.2022 | BG | 29.09.2022 | GB | 29.09.2022 | NO | 29.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | FR | 30.09.2022 | GR | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | IS | 29.10.2022 | PT | 31.10.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 07.09.2018 | |
AL | 29.06.2022 | ||
CY | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
IT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
MK | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
IE | 07.09.2022 | ||
LU | 07.09.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GB | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HU | 07.09.2018 | |
AL | 29.06.2022 | ||
CY | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
IT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
IE | 07.09.2022 | ||
LU | 07.09.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GB | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
CY | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
IT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
IE | 07.09.2022 | ||
LU | 07.09.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GB | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
IT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
IE | 07.09.2022 | ||
LU | 07.09.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GB | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
IE | 07.09.2022 | ||
LU | 07.09.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GB | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
IE | 07.09.2022 | ||
LU | 07.09.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
IE | 07.09.2022 | ||
LU | 07.09.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
IE | 07.09.2022 | ||
LU | 07.09.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
IE | 07.09.2022 | ||
LU | 07.09.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
LU | 07.09.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | EE | 29.06.2022 | |
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | EE | 29.06.2022 | |
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | EE | 29.06.2022 | |
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 29.06.2022 | |
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP2696421 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 1-13* paragraphs [0019] - [0034]; figures 5, 6 *; | [XYI]EP2889948 (NIKKISO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,7,8 * paragraphs [0025] - [0039]; figure 2 * [Y] 1-13 [I] 2,4-6,9-13 | by applicant | US2013111739 | US2014109396 |