EP3635518 - SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND GRAPHICAL USER INTERFACES FOR INTERACTING WITH AUGMENTED AND VIRTUAL REALITY ENVIRONMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.11.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2024/14] |
Former [2020/16] | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUENSTEIN, Mark K. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
MALIA, Joseph A. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 03 /
MISSIG, Julian One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 04 /
KRENN, Matthaeus One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 05 /
GIRLING, Lukas Robert Tom One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 06 /
HOFFNUNG, Amir One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 07 /
STAUBER, Matan One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 08 /
BERNSTEIN, Jeffrey T. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2024/14] |
Former [2020/16] | 01 /
HAUENSTEIN, Mark, K. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | ||
02 /
MALIA, Joseph, A. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | |||
03 /
MISSIG, Julian One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | |||
04 /
KRENN, Matthaeus One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | |||
05 /
GIRLING, Lukas Robert Tom One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | |||
06 /
HOFFNUNG, Amir One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | |||
07 /
STAUBER, Matan One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | |||
08 /
BERNSTEIN, Jeffrey, T. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2020/16] | Application number, filing date | 18778642.1 | 30.08.2018 | [2020/16] | WO2018US48884 | Priority number, date | US201762553063P | 31.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762553063 P | US201762564984P | 28.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762564984 P | DK2018PA70548 | 23.08.2018 Original published format: DK PA201870548 | US201816116276 | 29.08.2018 Original published format: US201816116276 | [2020/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019046597 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3635518 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3635518 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F3/0488, G06F3/0485, G02B27/01, G06T19/00, G06T7/00 | [2020/16] | CPC: |
G06F3/04815 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0484 (EP,DK,US);
G06F3/011 (EP,CN,US);
G02B27/017 (EP,CN,KR);
G06F3/005 (KR);
G06F3/012 (EP,US);
G06F3/013 (KR);
G06F3/014 (EP,US);
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
G06F3/04845 (EP,US);
G06F3/0485 (EP,CN,KR);
G06F3/0488 (EP,CN);
G06F3/04883 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06T19/006 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02B2027/0138 (EP,KR);
G02B2027/014 (EP,KR);
G02B2027/0178 (CN);
G02B2027/0187 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME, METHODEN UND GRAPHISCHE BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLEN ZUR INTERAKTION MIT ERWEITERTEN UND VITRUELLEN REALITÄTSUMGEBUNGEN | [2023/29] | English: | SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND GRAPHICAL USER INTERFACES FOR INTERACTING WITH AUGMENTED AND VIRTUAL REALITY ENVIRONMENTS | [2020/16] | French: | SYSTÈMES, MÉTHODES ET INTERFACE D'UTILISATEUR GRAPHIQUE POUR INTERAGIR AVEC ENVIRONNEMENTS DE RÉALITÉ AUGMENTÉE ET VIRTUELLE | [2023/51] |
Former [2020/16] | SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND GRAFISCHE BENUTZEROBERFLÄCHEN ZUR INTERAKTION MIT UMGEBUNGEN DER ERWEITERTEN UND VIRTUELLEN REALITÄT | ||
Former [2020/16] | SYSTÈMES, PROCÉDÉS ET INTERFACES UTILISATEUR GRAPHIQUES PERMETTANT D'INTERAGIR AVEC DES ENVIRONNEMENTS DE RÉALITÉ AUGMENTÉE ET VIRTUELLE | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 07.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24158812.8 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2012076062 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE], et al) [Y] 8 * page 4, line 22 - line 24 * * page 8, line 10 - line 35 *; | [XY]EP2738743 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-7,9-23 * abstract * * figures 1-6, 14-16 * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0108] * * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0129] * [Y] 8; | [A]US2014282220 (WANTLAND TIM [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] ** paragraph [0057] * |