EP3691611 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING PSEUDOANEURYSM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oxford University Innovation Limited Buxton Court 3 West Way Oxford, Oxfordshire OX2 0JB / GB | [2020/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Regent University of Oxford Wellington Square Oxford Oxfordshire OX1 2JD / GB | 02 /
HANDA, Ashok University of Oxford Wellington Square Oxford Oxfordshire OX1 2JD / GB | 03 /
STRIDE, Eleanor University of Oxford Wellington Square Oxford Oxfordshire OX1 2JD / GB | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/33] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18779004.3 | 24.09.2018 | [2020/33] | WO2018GB52710 | Priority number, date | GB20170016239 | 05.10.2017 Original published format: GB 201716239 | [2020/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019069047 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3691611 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/10, G01N1/00, A61P7/02 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61K38/366 (US);
A61K41/0052 (US);
A61K9/0009 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K9/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PSEUDOANEURYSMA | [2020/33] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING PSEUDOANEURYSM | [2020/33] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT D'UN PSEUDO-ANÉVRISME | [2020/33] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 10.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/46] | 27.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2009156743 (UCL BUSINESS PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-30 * page 1, lines 4-7 * * page 2, lines 22-27 * * page 3, lines 1-24 * * page 15, lines 22-34 * * page 16, lines 1-9 * * page 18, lines 12, 15 * * page 19, lines 9-31 * * page 42; claim 1 * * page 45; claim 16 * * page 46; claims 17-23 *; | [A] - JOSHUA OWEN ET AL, "Magnetic targeting of microbubbles against physiologically relevant flow conditions", INTERFACE FOCUS, GB, (20150821), vol. 5, no. 5, doi:10.1098/rsfs.2015.0001, ISSN 2042-8898, page 20150001, XP055521272 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1098/rsfs.2015.0001 | [A] - MARIE DE SAINT VICTOR ET AL, "Properties, characteristics and applications of microbubbles for sonothrombolysis", EXPERT OPINION ON DRUG DELIVERY, GB, (20140109), vol. 11, no. 2, doi:10.1517/17425247.2014.868434, ISSN 1742-5247, pages 187 - 209, XP055521320 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/17425247.2014.868434 |