EP3721630 - CONTEXT DERIVATION FOR COEFFICIENT CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUUSELA, Aki c/o Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View California 94043 / US | 02 /
HE, Dake c/o Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View California 94043 / US | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | Suckling, Andrew Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/42] | Williams, Michael David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 18779974.7 | 14.09.2018 | [2020/42] | WO2018US51041 | Priority number, date | US201715835501 | 08.12.2017 Original published format: US201715835501 | US201816033582 | 12.07.2018 Original published format: US201816033582 | [2020/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019112669 | Date: | 13.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3721630 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/91, H04N19/176, H04N19/13, H04N19/42 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
H04N19/91 (EP,CN);
H04N19/13 (EP,CN);
H04N19/124 (CN);
H04N19/127 (CN);
H04N19/176 (EP,CN);
H04N19/18 (CN);
H04N19/42 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] | Title | German: | KONTEXTABLEITUNG FÜR KOEFFIZIENTENCODIERUNG | [2020/42] | English: | CONTEXT DERIVATION FOR COEFFICIENT CODING | [2020/42] | French: | DÉRIVATION DE CONTEXTE POUR UN CODAGE DE COEFFICIENT | [2020/42] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 13.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/27] | 25.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US6990247 (SCHWARTZ EDWARD L [US]); | [I]WO2011138584 (ASPEX SEMICONDUCTOR LTD [GB], et al); | [I]WO2013130952 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); |